This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 04/25/2019 at 11:04:50 (UTC).

Da Roza, Ivette vs People's Trust Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 11/06/2018 Da Roza, Ivette filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against People's Trust Insurance Company. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Rice, G. Elizabeth. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0907

  • Filing Date:

    11/06/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Rice, G. Elizabeth

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Da Roza, Ronald

Hollywood, FL 33021

Da Roza, Ivette

Hollywood, FL 33021

Defendant

People's Trust Insurance Company

18 People'S Trust Way

Deerfield Beach, FL 33441

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FOGLIA , TRACEY A.

Attorney at FLORIDA PROFESSIONAL LAW GROUP, PLLC

4600 Sheridan St Ste 303

Hollywood, FL 33021

Defendant Attorney

MUMTAZ , SHEZAN H

Attorney at PEOPLES TRUST MGA, LLC.

18 Peoples Trust Way

Deerfield Beach, FL 33441

 

Court Documents

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

01/15/2019: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

01/03/2019: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

12/10/2018: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

11/29/2018: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

11/19/2018: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

11/07/2018: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/06/2018: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

11/06/2018: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

11/06/2018: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

COMPLAINT

11/06/2018: COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

11/06/2018: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

11/06/2018: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

11/06/2018: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/15/2019
  • ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Comment: DEFS; Additional Info: Defendant: People's Trust Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Comment: DEFENDANT S-PLAINTIFF S FIRST; Additional Info: Defendant: People's Trust Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Comment: DEF'S - FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLTF'S COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Defendant: People's Trust Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Comment: DEFENDANT S - AND E-MAIL DESIGNATIONS - SHEZAN MUMTAZ, ESQ.; Additional Info: Defendant: People's Trust Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS; Comment: BY THE CHIEF FINANCIAL OFFICER OF THE STATE OF FLORIDA. ELECTRONIC DELIVERY TO PEOPLE'S TRUST INSURANCE COMPANY, 11/19/18; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Da Roza, Ivette; Plaintiff: Da Roza, Ronald

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X1 - tfoglia@flplg.com ; eservice@flplg.com ; nwoods@flplg.com ; Additional Info: Defendant: People's Trust Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • File Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Da Roza, Ivette; Plaintiff: Da Roza, Ronald

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Da Roza, Ivette; Plaintiff: Da Roza, Ronald

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Da Roza, Ivette; Plaintiff: Da Roza, Ronald

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Da Roza, Ivette; Plaintiff: Da Roza, Ronald

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Da Roza, Ivette; Plaintiff: Da Roza, Ronald

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Da Roza, Ivette; Plaintiff: Da Roza, Ronald

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Da Roza, Ivette; Plaintiff: Da Roza, Ronald

    Read MoreRead Less