This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 10/20/2021 at 05:42:33 (UTC).

Czopek, Diana I vs General Motors LLC

Case Summary

On 09/23/2021 Czopek, Diana I filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against General Motors LLC. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Wolfe, Mark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7689

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Wolfe, Mark

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Czopek, Alex F

Chicago, IL 60602

Czopek, Diana I

Chicago, IL 60602

Defendant

General Motors LLC

1201 Hays Streeet

Tallahassee, FL 32301-2525

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PATRICK , RYAN EDWARD

Attorney at KROHN & MOSS, LTD.

10 N Dearborn St Fl 3

Chicago, IL 60602

Defendant Attorney

MITCHELL , CHARLES PENDLETON

Attorney at RUMBERGER KIRK & CALDWELL

Po Box 1873

Orlando, FL 32802

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

10/12/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/23/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

09/23/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

09/23/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COMPLAINT

09/23/2021: COMPLAINT

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

09/23/2021: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

09/23/2021: General Differentiated Case Management Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2022
  • HearingDifferentiated Case Management; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Hearing Location: HTTPS://ZOOM.US/J/91757641087 MEETING ID 917 5764 1087PASSWORD 973927 Judicial Officer: Wolfe, Mark

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: General Motors LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketAMENDED COMPLAINT; Comment: NO COS / EXHIBITS ATTACHED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Czopek, Alex F; Plaintiff: Czopek, Diana I

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Czopek, Alex F; Plaintiff: Czopek, Diana I

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Czopek, Alex F; Plaintiff: Czopek, Diana I

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Czopek, Alex F; Plaintiff: Czopek, Diana I

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketINTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Czopek, Alex F; Plaintiff: Czopek, Diana I

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Czopek, Alex F; Plaintiff: Czopek, Diana I

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Czopek, Alex F; Plaintiff: Czopek, Diana I

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Czopek, Alex F; Plaintiff: Czopek, Diana I

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: x1; Additional Info: Defendant: General Motors LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where General Motors, LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MITCHELL, CHARLES PENDLETON