This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 09/03/2021 at 14:18:42 (UTC).

Cundiff, Wayne vs General R.V. Center, Inc.,

Case Summary

On 07/27/2020 Cundiff, Wayne filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against General R. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Criminal Court Annex located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Valkenburg, V.. Miriam and Valkenburg, Miriam. V.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3538

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Valkenburg, V.. Miriam

Valkenburg, Miriam. V.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Cundiff, Wayne

Tampa, FL 33609

GENERAL R V CENTER TAMPS

Defendants

General R.V. Center, Inc.,

13396 East Us Highway 92

Dover, FL 33527

GENERAL R V CENTER TAMPA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

CREMEENS , JEANNE MICHELLE

Attorney at CREMEENS LAW GROUP

5100 W Kennedy Blvd Ste 270

Tampa, FL 33609

BARAUSKAS, ALEKSAS ANDRIUS

Attorney at AKERMAN LLP

50 N Laura St Ste 3100

Jacksonville, FL 32202

 

Court Documents

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

07/29/2020: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

COMPLAINT

07/27/2020: COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

07/27/2020: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/27/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

NOTICE

08/12/2020: NOTICE

NOTICE OF FILING

09/04/2020: NOTICE OF FILING

MOTION TO DISMISS

10/26/2020: MOTION TO DISMISS

NOTICE OF HEARING

11/05/2020: NOTICE OF HEARING

COURT TICKET

02/15/2021: COURT TICKET

ORDER OF DISMISSAL

03/23/2021: ORDER OF DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • JudgementJudgment Code: ODISM; Judgment Description: ORDER OF DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2021143316; Judge: Valkenburg, Miriam V.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT TICKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketRESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Cundiff, Wayne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; Comment: Monday, February 15, 2021 AT 11AM; Additional Info: Defendant: General R.V. Center, Inc.,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS; Comment: PLTFS COMPLAINT AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW; Additional Info: Defendant: General R.V. Center, Inc.,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Comment: WAIVER OF SERVICE PROCESS. ATTACHED.; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Cundiff, Wayne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE; Comment: OF COMMENCEMENT OF ACTION AND REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Cundiff, Wayne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: General R.V. Center, Inc.,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Cundiff, Wayne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Cundiff, Wayne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Cundiff, Wayne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Cundiff, Wayne

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GENERAL RV CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BARAUSKAS, ALEKSAS ANDRIUS