This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 03/20/2023 at 07:22:00 (UTC).

Cruit, Mitchell vs Koster Konstruction Inc

Case Summary

On 10/19/2022 Cruit, Mitchell filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Koster Konstruction Inc. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Barbas, Rex. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8769

  • Filing Date:

    10/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Barbas, Rex

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Cruit, Mitchell

Tampa, FL 33602

Cruit, Rebecca

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendant

Koster Konstruction Inc

18507 Crooked Lane

Lutz, FL 33548

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SAVITZ , EDWARD OWEN

Po Box 3913

Tampa, FL 33601

Defendant Attorney

HARDER , GEORGE F

Attorney at HARDER LAW

23110 State Road 54 # 157

Lutz, FL 33549

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

03/16/2023: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

03/10/2023: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

02/07/2023: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

02/07/2023: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF SERVING

01/17/2023: NOTICE OF SERVING

ORDER GRANTING

01/17/2023: ORDER GRANTING

STIPULATION

01/12/2023: STIPULATION

ORDER

01/12/2023: ORDER

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

01/05/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

MOTION TO SET ASIDE

01/05/2023: MOTION TO SET ASIDE

EXHIBIT

01/05/2023: EXHIBIT

NOTICE OF HEARING

12/13/2022: NOTICE OF HEARING

AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS

12/07/2022: AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

12/06/2022: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

AFFIDAVIT

12/06/2022: AFFIDAVIT

DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

11/28/2022: DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

11/21/2022: MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

11/01/2022: 20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2023
  • HearingDifferentiated Case Management; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Hearing Location: COURTROOM 501 800 E TWIGGS ST TAMPA, FL 33602;; Judicial Officer: Barbas, Rex

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • HearingJAWS HEARING; Cancelled Comments: Per Judge's Order; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING; Additional Info: Defendant: Koster Konstruction Inc;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING; Comment: VACATION OF DEFAULT AND FILING OF ANSWER AND DEFENSES 01/17/23 RMB; Additional Info: Defendant: Koster Konstruction Inc; Date Signed: 01/17/2023; Judicial Officer:: Barbas, Rex;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER; Comment: REQUIRING ELECTRONIC/TELEPHONIC APPEARANCES ON 01/24/23 AT 9:00 AM 01/12/23 JMB; Additional Info: Defendant: Koster Konstruction Inc; Plaintiff: Cruit, Mitchell; Plaintiff: Cruit, Rebecca; Private Attorney: HARDER , GEORGE F; Private Attorney: SAVITZ , EDWARD OWEN; Date 2: 01/12/2023; Judicial Officer:: Barbas, Rex;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK; Additional Info: Defendant: Koster Konstruction Inc;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Cruit, Mitchell; Plaintiff: Cruit, Rebecca;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Cruit, Mitchell; Plaintiff: Cruit, Rebecca;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Cruit, Mitchell; Plaintiff: Cruit, Rebecca;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Cruit, Mitchell; Plaintiff: Cruit, Rebecca;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Cruit, Mitchell; Plaintiff: Cruit, Rebecca;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X1; Additional Info: Defendant: Koster Konstruction Inc;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less