Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 06/16/2021 at 01:03:27 (UTC).

Crown Asset Management, LLC vs Perry, Queen M

Case Summary

On 04/16/2021 Crown Asset Management, LLC filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Perry, Queen M. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Bagge-Hernandez, Michael. C, Bagge-Hernandez, C. Michael and Bagge-Hernandez, Michael C. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6672

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Bagge-Hernandez, Michael. C

Bagge-Hernandez, C. Michael

Bagge-Hernandez, Michael C

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Crown Asset Management, LLC

3100 Breckenridge Blvd. Suite 725

Duluth, GA 30096

Defendant

Perry, Queen M

Dover, FL 33527

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HUDSON , YACENDA KELA

Attorney at TROMBERG, MORRIS & POULIN, PLLC

1515 S Federal Hwy Ste 100

Boca Raton, FL 33432

 

Court Documents

E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

04/20/2021: E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

04/16/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/16/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2021
  • HearingPRETRIAL; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Hearing Location: COURTROOM 304 3RD FL 800 E TWIGGS ST TAMPA, FL 33602; Judicial Officer: Bagge-Hernandez, Michael C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketCOURT TICKET; Comment: AT PRETRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketORDER; Comment: ZOOM NOTICE AND POSSIBLE WAIVER OF APPEARANCE AT SMALL CLAIMS PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE BY FILING ANSWER FORM OR SETTLEMENT STIPULATION; Additional Info: Defendant: Perry, Queen M; Plaintiff: Crown Asset Management, LLC; Private Attorney: HUDSON , YACENDA KELA; Date 2: 05/19/2021; Judicial Officer: Bagge-Hernandez, Michael C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET; Additional Info: Defendant: Perry, Queen M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Crown Asset Management, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Crown Asset Management, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Crown Asset Management, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Crown Asset Management, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Crown Asset Management, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Crown Asset Management LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HUDSON YACENDA K