This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 05/23/2023 at 07:31:13 (UTC).

Crown Asset Management, Llc vs Miller, Christopher

Case Summary

On 03/09/2023 Crown Asset Management, Llc filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Miller, Christopher. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Giardina, James S, Giardina, James. S and Giardina, S. James. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9916

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Giardina, James S

Giardina, James. S

Giardina, S. James

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Crown Asset Management, Llc

Defendant

Miller, Christopher

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KAPLAN , JOSHUA MATTHEW

 

Court Documents

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

03/09/2023: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

03/09/2023: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

03/09/2023: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

03/09/2023: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

CIVIL COVER SHEET

03/09/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

03/10/2023: E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

03/11/2023: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

04/10/2023: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

04/10/2023: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2023
  • HearingPRETRIAL; Cancelled Comments: Voluntary Dismissal of Cause; Hearing Time: 02:00 PM; Hearing Location: HTTPS://ZOOM.US/J/97219657408 ZOOM MEETING ID IS 972-1965-7408PASSWORD IS 031612; Judicial Officer: Giardina, James S

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • JudgementJudgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2023186256; Judge: Giardina, James S

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Crown Asset Management, Llc;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Crown Asset Management, Llc;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: Christopher Miller 3/11/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET; Additional Info: Defendant: Miller, Christopher;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Crown Asset Management, Llc;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Crown Asset Management, Llc;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Crown Asset Management, Llc;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Crown Asset Management, Llc;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Crown Asset Management, Llc;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less