Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 04/24/2021 at 06:09:12 (UTC).

Crown Asset Management LLC vs Lovick, Vivian

Case Summary

On 04/06/2021 Crown Asset Management LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Lovick, Vivian. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Ober, Ann. Joelle and Ober, Joelle. Ann. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2997

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Ober, Ann. Joelle

Ober, Joelle. Ann

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Crown Asset Management LLC

887 Donald Ross Road

Juno Beach, FL 33408

Defendants

Lovick, Vivian

Tempa, FL 33619

Drew, Darrell

Tempa, FL 33619-5549

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PALMA , JORGE LUIS

Attorney at ANDREU, PALMA, LAVIN & SOLIS, PLLC

815 Nw 57Th Ave Ste 401

Miami, FL 33126

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

04/06/2021: COMPLAINT

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

04/07/2021: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

04/07/2021: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/06/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

04/06/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

04/06/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

04/06/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2021
  • Docket20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: 4/15/2021 DEFT VIVIAN LOVICK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: DARRELL DREW 04/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Lovick, Vivian

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Drew, Darrell

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Crown Asset Management LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Crown Asset Management LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Crown Asset Management LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Crown Asset Management LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO RULE 2-420; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Crown Asset Management LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Crown Asset Management LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Crown Asset Management LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Palma, Jorge L, ESQ.