This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 01/17/2021 at 20:24:25 (UTC).

Cross Creek II Master Association, Inc. vs Talbot, Michael

Case Summary

On 11/30/2020 Cross Creek II Master Association, Inc filed an Other lawsuit against Talbot, Michael. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Bagge-Hernandez, C. Michael and Bagge-Hernandez, Michael. C. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4261

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Bagge-Hernandez, C. Michael

Bagge-Hernandez, Michael. C

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cross Creek II Master Association, Inc.

5550 W. Executive Drive Suite 250

Tampa, FL 33609

Defendants

Talbot, Pamela

Tampa, FL 33647

Unknown Tenant 2

Tampa, FL 33647

Talbot, Michael

Tampa, FL 33647

Unknown Tenant 1

Tampa, FL 33647

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROSS , BRENTON JOSEPH

Attorney at FRISCIA & ROSS P A

5550 W Executive Dr Ste 250

Tampa, FL 33609

 

Court Documents

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

12/03/2020: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

12/03/2020: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

12/03/2020: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

12/03/2020: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

01/07/2021: DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/30/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

11/30/2020: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/30/2020: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/30/2020: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/30/2020: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/30/2020: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK; Additional Info: Defendant: Talbot, Michael; Defendant: Talbot, Pamela

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK; Additional Info: Defendant: Talbot, Michael; Defendant: Talbot, Pamela

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketSignature Page For Clerk's Default; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Cross Creek II Master Association, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED; Comment: MICHAEL TALBOT 12/12/20; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Cross Creek II Master Association, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED; Comment: 12/12/20 PAMELA TALBOT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Cross Creek II Master Association, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED; Comment: UNKNOWN TENANT 2; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Cross Creek II Master Association, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED; Comment: UNKNOWN TENANT 1; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Cross Creek II Master Association, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Talbot, Michael

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Talbot, Pamela

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Unknown Tenant 1

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Cross Creek II Master Association, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Cross Creek II Master Association, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Cross Creek II Master Association, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Cross Creek II Master Association, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Cross Creek II Master Association, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Cross Creek II Master Association, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketLIS PENDENS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Cross Creek II Master Association, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketLIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Cross Creek II Master Association, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less