This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 10/15/2021 at 00:24:33 (UTC).

Cropper, Frederick vs Florida Anesthesia Medical Services 1, P.A.

Case Summary

On 08/03/2021 Cropper, Frederick filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Florida Anesthesia Medical Services 1, P A. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Bagge-Hernandez, Michael C, Bagge-Hernandez, C. Michael and Bagge-Hernandez, Michael. C. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3388

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Bagge-Hernandez, Michael C

Bagge-Hernandez, C. Michael

Bagge-Hernandez, Michael. C

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cropper, Frederick

Riverview, FL 33578

Defendants

Florida Anesthesia Medical Services 1, P.A.

1201 Hays Street

Tallahassee, FL 32301

Team Health, Inc.

3231 North Star Circle

Louisville, TN 37777

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KOTLER , YULI

Attorney at KOTLER LAW PLLC

Po Box 22411

St Petersburg, FL 33742

 

Court Documents

ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO - FOR

08/26/2021: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO - FOR

MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC HEARING

08/25/2021: MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC HEARING

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED

08/19/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED

08/18/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

08/03/2021: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

08/03/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

08/03/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

08/04/2021: E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

08/04/2021: E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

CIVIL COVER SHEET

08/03/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

08/03/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

08/03/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

08/03/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2021
  • HearingPRETRIAL; Cancelled Comments: Other REMOVED TO FEDERAL COURT; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Hearing Location: COURTROOM 304 3RD FL 800 E TWIGGS ST TAMPA, FL 33602; Judicial Officer: Bagge-Hernandez, Michael C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2021
  • DocketORDER; Comment: ZOOM NOTICE AND POSSIBLE WAIVER OF APPEARANCE AT SMALL CLAIMS PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE BY FILING ANSWER FORM OR SETTLEMENT STIPULATION; Additional Info: Date 2: 09/12/2021; Judicial Officer: Bagge-Hernandez, Michael C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • JudgementJudgment Code: NORFC; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT; Judge: Bagge-Hernandez, Michael C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT; Additional Info: Defendant: Florida Anesthesia Medical Services 1, P.A.; Defendant: Team Health, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Additional Info: Defendant: Florida Anesthesia Medical Services 1, P.A.; Defendant: Team Health, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING MOTION TO - FOR; Comment: ZOOM/TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Cropper, Frederick; Date Signed: 08/26/2021; Judicial Officer: Bagge-Hernandez, Michael C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR TELEPHONIC HEARING; Comment: (ZOOM); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Cropper, Frederick

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED; Comment: 8/16/21 TEAM HEALTH INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED; Comment: 08/12/2021 DEFT. FLORIDA ANESTHESIA MEDICAL SERVICES 1, P. A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET; Comment: X2; Additional Info: Defendant: Florida Anesthesia Medical Services 1, P.A.; Defendant: Team Health, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET; Comment: X2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Cropper, Frederick

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Cropper, Frederick

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Cropper, Frederick

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Cropper, Frederick

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Cropper, Frederick

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Team Health is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KOTLER , YULI