Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 03/01/2019 at 06:10:51 (UTC).

CRIMSON PORTFOLIO LLC vs SCHERER, CLARK H, III

Case Summary

On 06/20/2016 CRIMSON PORTFOLIO LLC filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against SCHERER, CLARK H, III. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Stephens, Scott. Steven and Thomas, K. Cheryl. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5768

  • Filing Date:

    06/20/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Stephens, Scott. Steven

Thomas, K. Cheryl

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CRIMSON PORTFOLIO LLC

Defendants

SCHERER, CLARK H, III

St Petersburg, FL 33713

ACCURATE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, LLC

COMPASS ACQUISITION & DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION

SCHERER HOLDINGS, LLC

COMPASS DEVELOPMENT GROUP, LLC

SCHERER CONSTRUCTION OF WEST FLORIDA, LLC

RIVER VISTA, LLC

DG HOPEDALE, LLC

COMPASS USA, LTD

CLARK H SCHERER III TRUST

DGI, LLC

DG LORDSTOWN, LLC

CHS ASSET HIOLDINGS, LLC

OAKDALE WYLIE, CORP

SCHERER HOLDINGS, INC

DG ELLSWORTH, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WESTER , JANETTE MEREDITH

Attorney at MECHANIK NUCCIO HEARNE & WESTER, P.A.

305 S Boulevard

Tampa, FL 33606

Defendant Attorneys

GOMEZ , ALBERTO F, Jr

Attorney at JOHNSON POPE BOKOR RUPPEL & BURNS, LLP

401 E Jackson St Ste 3100

Tampa, FL 33602

STAYTON , BRIAN FREDERICK

Attorney at STAYTON LAW GROUP, P.A.

3619 Lithia Pinecrest Rd

Valrico, FL 33596

 

Court Documents

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

05/04/2017: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

EMERGENCY MOTION HANDLING ORDER

05/04/2017: EMERGENCY MOTION HANDLING ORDER

ORDER OF TRANSFER TO

05/04/2017: ORDER OF TRANSFER TO

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

04/25/2017: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

04/25/2017: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

04/25/2017: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

04/25/2017: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

ORDER GRANTING

04/20/2017: ORDER GRANTING

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

12/13/2016: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

05/08/2017: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

MOTION TO TRANSFER TO COMPLEX BUSINESS LITIGATION DIVISION

04/27/2017: MOTION TO TRANSFER TO COMPLEX BUSINESS LITIGATION DIVISION

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

04/25/2017: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

04/25/2017: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

04/25/2017: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

04/25/2017: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

04/25/2017: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

04/25/2017: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF HEARING

03/09/2017: NOTICE OF HEARING

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2018
  • SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT; Comment: AGAINST CLARK H. SCHERER, III

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • AGREED ORDER; Comment: APPROVING SETTLEMENT BY AND BETWEEN ALL PARTIES - 07/06/17 SSS; Additional Info: Date Signed: 07/08/2017; Judicial Officer: Stephens, Steven Scott

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON - TO - FOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • ORDER SETTING HEARING; Comment: EVIDENTIARY HEARING: JULY 7, 2017 AT 9:30 AM ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO APPOINT RECEIVER -- 06/27/17 SSS; Additional Info: Date 2: 06/27/2017; Judicial Officer: Stephens, Steven Scott

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES; Comment: SUPPLEMENTAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • EXHIBIT LIST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • WITNESS LIST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • WITNESS LIST; Comment: PLAINTIFF'S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • JOINT; Comment: PREHEARING CONFERENCE REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Comment: AND OBJECTIONS TO FIRST - FOR EVIDENTIARY HEARING SET FOR 6/19/17 FROM DFDT TO PLTFF

    Read MoreRead Less
72 More Docket Entries
  • 06/21/2016
  • SEE DOCKET TEXT; Comment: COPY OF REGISTERED MAIL RECEIPT FOR MAILING TO CLARK H SCHERER III

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2016
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2016
  • AFFIDAVIT OF CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2016
  • AFFIDAVIT OF CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2016
  • REGISTERED MAIL TO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2016
  • ENFORCE ORDER COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2016
  • ENFORCE ORDER COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2016
  • Fee Worksheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2016
  • NOTICE OF RECORDING FOREIGN JUDGMENT PREPARED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment Code: OOTF; Judgment Description: ORDER ON - TO - FOR; Instrument Number: 2018096618; Judge: Stephens, Steven Scott

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WESTER , JANETTE MEREDITH