Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 02/28/2019 at 08:45:52 (UTC).

Crews, Kelvin R vs Tampa Port Authority

Case Summary

On 02/03/2016 Crews, Kelvin R filed an Other lawsuit against Tampa Port Authority. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Battles, L. Emmett. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1066

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Battles, L. Emmett

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Crews, Kelvin R

Hillsborough, Tampa, FL 33602

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Efficiency Shoring & Supply

Tampa, FL 33637

TB Landmark Construction, Inc.

12220 New Berlin Rd.

Jacksonville, FL 32226

Tampa Port Authority

1101 Channelside Dr.

Hillsborough, Tampa,, FL 33602

Ferguson Enterprises Inc

7816 Professional Place

Tampa, FL 33637

Neff Rental LLC

3750 Nw 87Th Ave., Suite 400

Miami, FL 33187

Bedrock Resources LLC

2441 E. King St., Suite 202

Ocala, FL 34471

Kincart Construction Company

1875 W. Main St.

Polk, Bartow, FL 33830

Raulerson & Son Inc

10611 Raulerson Ranch Rd.

Tampa, FL 33637

Cross Defendant

Kincart Construction Co

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STANLEY , STEPHEN JAY

Attorney at STEPHEN J. STANLEY, ATTORNEY

412 E Madison St Ste 1100

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

KAPUSTA , KEVIN JAMES

1 N Dale Mabry Hwy

Tampa, FL 33609

KAYAN , BORA SABIH

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE SARASOTA COUNTY ATTORNEY

1660 Ringling Blvd Fl 2

Sarasota, FL 34236-6808

BIRTHISEL , ROBERT BLAINE

100 S Ashley Dr Ste 1210

Tampa, FL 33602

AIELLO , JULIE ANN

Attorney at MARSHALL DENNEHEY WARNER COLEMAN & GOGGI

201 E Kennedy Blvd Ste 1100

Tampa, FL 33602

DENNEN , CYNTHIA MOORE

Attorney at HAMILTON, MILLER & BIRTHISEL

100 S Ashley Dr Ste 1210

Tampa, FL 33602

SMOAK, WILLIAM G K, Esquire

Attorney at SMOAK, CHISTOLINI & BARNETT PLLC

320 W Kennedy Blvd Fl 4

Tampa, FL 33606-1453

TERRY , SCOTT LEE

Attorney at FLORIN GRAY BOUZAS OWENS

16524 Pointe Village Dr

Lutz, FL 33558

JONES , GREGORY DAVID

Attorney at RYWANT, ALVAREZ, JONES, RUSSO AND GUYTON

Po Box 3283

Tampa, FL 33601-3283

PARKER , JORDAN LYNN

Attorney at GARRISON, YOUNT, FORTE & MULCAHY, L.L.C.

601 Bayshore Blvd Ste 800

Tampa, FL 33606

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorney

JONES , GREGORY DAVID

Attorney at RYWANT, ALVAREZ, JONES, RUSSO AND GUYTON

Po Box 3283

Tampa, FL 33601-3283

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL SETTLEMENT

10/10/2018: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL SETTLEMENT

AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING

02/21/2018: AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF HEARING

01/29/2018: NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF PROVIDING RECORDS

06/07/2017: NOTICE OF PROVIDING RECORDS

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

08/18/2016: RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COMPLAINT

03/18/2016: MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COMPLAINT

20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

03/10/2016: 20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

MOTION TO DISMISS

02/29/2016: MOTION TO DISMISS

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

02/03/2016: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY

09/21/2018: MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY

AMENDED ORDER

06/12/2018: AMENDED ORDER

AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING

08/02/2017: AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

07/29/2016: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES

07/01/2016: ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL

06/23/2016: NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

03/31/2016: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

02/03/2016: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

02/03/2016: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

81 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2019
  • NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Crews, Kelvin R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Crews, Kelvin R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL SETTLEMENT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Crews, Kelvin R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Crews, Kelvin R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; Additional Info: Defendant: Tampa Port Authority

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION; Comment: HILLSBOROUGH COUNTY; Additional Info: Defendant: Tampa Port Authority

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Comment: CMC ON 03/06/2019 AT 10:45 AM; Additional Info: Cross-Defendant: Kincart Construction Co; Cross-Plaintiff: Tampa Port Authority; Defendant: Bedrock Resources LLC; Defendant: Efficiency Shoring & Supply; Defendant: Ferguson Enterprises Inc; Defendant: Kincart Construction Company; Defendant: Neff Rental LLC; Defendant: Raulerson & Son Inc; Defendant: Tampa Port Authority; Defendant: TB Landmark Construction, Inc.; Plaintiff: Crews, Kelvin R; Private Attorney: BIRTHISEL, ROBERT BLAINE; Private Attorney: JONES, GREGORY D, Esquire; Private Attorney: KAPUSTA, KEVIN JAMES; Private Attorney: KAYAN, BORA SABIH; Private Attorney: PARKER , JORDAN LYNN; Private Attorney: SMOAK, WILLIAM G K, Esquire; Private Attorney: STANLEY, STEPHEN J; Private Attorney: TERRY, SCOTT LEE; Date Signed: 02/20/2019; Judicial Officer: Battles, Emmett L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO COMPEL; Comment: DEFENDANT, TAMPA PORT AUTHORITY'S, AMENDED MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY RESPONSES FROM PLAINTIFF TO EXPERT/UPDATE INTERROGATORIES AND EXPERT/UPDATE REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION - PLTF SHALL PROVIDE ANSWERS WITHOUT OBJECTIONS TO TAMPA PORT AUTHORITYS EXPERT/; Additional Info: Defendant: Tampa Port Authority; Date Signed: 02/19/2019; Judicial Officer: Battles, Emmett L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO COMPEL; Comment: DEFENDANT, TAMPA PORT AUTHORITY'S, AMENDED MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY RESPONSES FROM PLAINTIFF TO EXPERT/UPDATE INTERROGATORIES AND EXPERT/UPDATE REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION - PLTF SHALL PROVIDE ANSWERS WITHOUT OBJECTIONS TO TAMPA PORT AUTHORITYS EXPERT/

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Additional Info: Defendant: Tampa Port Authority

    Read MoreRead Less
301 More Docket Entries
  • 02/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Defendant: Tampa Port Authority

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Defendant: Kincart Construction Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Defendant: TB Landmark Construction, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Defendant: Bedrock Resources LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2016244874; Judge: Battles, Emmett L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment Code: NDISM; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2016190396; Judge: Battles, Emmett L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2016
  • Judgment Code: NDISM; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2016154945; Judge: Battles, Emmett L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2016
  • Judgment Code: NDISM; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2016154922; Judge: Battles, Emmett L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment Code: NDISM; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2016066014

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TB LANDMARK CONSTRUCTION INC is a litigant

Latest cases where NEFF RENTAL LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Tampa Port Authority is a litigant