This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 08/12/2022 at 17:14:26 (UTC).

CREDIT CORP SOLUTIONS INC vs ELLENBERGER, JUSTIN

Case Summary

On 06/29/2022 CREDIT CORP SOLUTIONS INC filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against ELLENBERGER, JUSTIN. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Bagge-Hernandez, C. Michael, Bagge-Hernandez, Michael C and Bagge-Hernandez, Michael. C. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6202

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Bagge-Hernandez, Michael C

Bagge-Hernandez, C. Michael

Bagge-Hernandez, Michael. C

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CREDIT CORP SOLUTIONS INC

5104 S Westshore Blvd

Tampa, FL 33611

Defendant

ELLENBERGER, JUSTIN

Thonotosassa, FL 33592

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARCADIS , RALPH SAM

5104 S West Shore Blvd

Tampa, FL 33611

 

Court Documents

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

06/29/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

06/29/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/29/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

06/30/2022: E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

08/08/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/09/2022
  • HearingPRETRIAL; Cancelled Comments: Non-Service on Summons; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Hearing Location: COURTROOM 304 3RD FL 800 E TWIGGS ST TAMPA, FL 33602; Judicial Officer: Bagge-Hernandez, Michael C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED; Comment: JUSTIN ELLENBERGER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET; Additional Info: Defendant: ELLENBERGER, JUSTIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: CREDIT CORP SOLUTIONS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: CREDIT CORP SOLUTIONS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: CREDIT CORP SOLUTIONS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: CREDIT CORP SOLUTIONS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO RULE 2-420; Additional Info: Plaintiff: CREDIT CORP SOLUTIONS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CREDIT CORP SOLUTIONS INC. ASSIGNEE OF SYNCHRONY BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Marcadis, Ralph S