This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 09/13/2020 at 17:20:33 (UTC).

Credit Acceptance Corp vs Seelye, Clemon

Case Summary

On 07/10/2020 Credit Acceptance Corp filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Seelye, Clemon. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Costello, Jessica. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0582

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Costello, Jessica

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Credit Acceptance Corp

9210 King Palm Dr

Tampa, FL 33619

Defendant

Seelye, Clemon

Tampa, FL 33594

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIDD , EVAN D

Attorney at CONSUEGRA LAW

9210 King Palm Dr

Tampa, FL 33619

 

Court Documents

ANSWER

08/25/2020: ANSWER

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

07/13/2020: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Additional Info: Defendant: Seelye, Clemon

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: CLEMON SEELYE. 8/5/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Seelye, Clemon

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Credit Acceptance Corp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Credit Acceptance Corp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Credit Acceptance Corp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Credit Acceptance Corp

    Read MoreRead Less