This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 11/22/2022 at 18:02:12 (UTC).

Creative Choice Homes XXXI LTD vs Currie, Sonia

Case Summary

On 03/02/2021 Creative Choice Homes XXXI LTD filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Currie, Sonia. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Costello, Jessica. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0394

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Costello, Jessica

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Creative Choice Homes XXXI LTD

4121 Royal Banyan Drive

Tampa, FL 33610

PARK TERRACE APARTMENTS

Defendant

Currie, Sonia

Tampa, FL 33610

 

Court Documents

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

03/02/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

03/02/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

03/02/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

03/04/2021: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

03/31/2021: WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

03/05/2021: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

ANSWER

03/12/2021: ANSWER

MOTION TO STRIKE

03/18/2021: MOTION TO STRIKE

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

03/18/2021: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

E-FILED PROPOSED WRIT OF POSSESSION

03/30/2021: E-FILED PROPOSED WRIT OF POSSESSION

AFFIDAVIT OF POSTED SERVICE RETURNED SERVED

05/22/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF POSTED SERVICE RETURNED SERVED

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF POSTED SERVICE RETURNED SERVED; Comment: WRIT OF POSSESSION; Additional Info: Defendant: Currie, Sonia; Date 2: 04/21/2021;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF POSTED SERVICE RETURNED SERVED; Comment: DEFENDANT ALL OTHERS IN POSSESSION - SERVED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Creative Choice Homes XXXI LTD; Date 2: 04/21/2021;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED PROPOSED WRIT OF POSSESSION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Creative Choice Homes XXXI LTD;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • JudgementJudgment Code: JFP; Judgment Description: JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION; Instrument Number: 2021148124; Judge: Costello, Jessica

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketJUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: SONIA CURRIE 3/8/21; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Creative Choice Homes XXXI LTD;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO STRIKE; Comment: DEFENDANTS DEFENSIVE PLEADING/ANSWER, MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT FOR EVICTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Creative Choice Homes XXXI LTD;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Additional Info: Defendant: Currie, Sonia;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Additional Info: Defendant: Currie, Sonia;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Currie, Sonia;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Creative Choice Homes XXXI LTD;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Creative Choice Homes XXXI LTD;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Creative Choice Homes XXXI LTD;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Creative Choice Homes XXXI LTD;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PARK TERRACE APARTMENTS is a litigant

Latest cases where Creative Choice Homes XXXI LTD is a litigant