This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 01/14/2023 at 08:46:07 (UTC).

Crawford, Bryan K vs KB Home

Case Summary

On 08/01/2022 Crawford, Bryan K filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against KB Home. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Gaylord Moe, Anne-Leigh. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6440

  • Filing Date:

    08/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Gaylord Moe, Anne-Leigh

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Crawford, Bryan K

Palm Harbor, FL 34683

Crawford, Teasha K

Palm Harbor, FL 34683

Defendants and 3Rd Party Plaintiffs

KB Home

Wilmington, DE 19808

KB Home Florida LLC

C/O Corporation Service Company As Ra 1201 Hays Street

Tallahassee, FL 32301

KB Home Tampa LLC

C/O Corporation Service Company As Ra 1201 Hays Street

Tallahassee, FL 32310

3Rd Party Defendants

A&B STUCCO, INC.

SUPERIOR COATING SYSTEMS, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

OBRIEN , NEIL PATRICK

Attorney at FLORIN ROEBIG P.A.

777 Alderman Rd

Palm Harbor, FL 34683

Defendant and 3Rd Party Plaintiff Attorneys

CHAABAN , DANA

Attorney at CARLTON FIELDS, P.A.

2 Miamicentral 700 Nw 1St Ave Ste 1200

Miami, FL 33136

HECKERT , KATHERINE LEE

Attorney at CARLTON FIELDS, P.A.

4221 W Boy Scout Blvd Ste 1000

Tampa, FL 33607

 

Court Documents

20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

11/04/2022: 20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

11/01/2022: 20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

10/31/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

10/12/2022: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

10/12/2022: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

10/12/2022: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

10/12/2022: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT

08/23/2022: E-FILED THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT

20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

08/04/2022: 20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

COMPLAINT

08/01/2022: COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

08/01/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

08/01/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

08/01/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

08/01/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

Extended Differentiated Case Management Order

08/01/2022: Extended Differentiated Case Management Order

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

08/01/2022: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

08/01/2022: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

08/01/2022: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2023
  • HearingDifferentiated Case Management; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Hearing Location: WEBEX: 1-904-900-2303 OR 1-415-655-0001 ACCESS CODE: 132 571 5688; Judicial Officer: Gaylord Moe, Anne-Leigh

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Additional Info: Defendant: KB Home Tampa LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Additional Info: Defendant: KB Home Tampa LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: KB Home Tampa LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Defendant: KB Home Tampa LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Defendant: KB Home Tampa LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X2; Additional Info: Third Party Defendant: A&B STUCCO, INC.; Third Party Defendant: SUPERIOR COATING SYSTEMS, INC.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT; Comment: COS 08/23/2022 / EXHIBITS ATTACHED; Additional Info: Defendant: KB Home Tampa LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: KB HOME FLORIDA, LLC 8/3/2022; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Crawford, Bryan K; Plaintiff: Crawford, Teasha K;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Crawford, Bryan K; Plaintiff: Crawford, Teasha K;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Crawford, Bryan K; Plaintiff: Crawford, Teasha K;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Crawford, Bryan K; Plaintiff: Crawford, Teasha K;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Crawford, Bryan K; Plaintiff: Crawford, Teasha K;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Crawford, Bryan K; Plaintiff: Crawford, Teasha K;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Crawford, Bryan K; Plaintiff: Crawford, Teasha K;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketExtended Differentiated Case Management Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X3; Additional Info: Defendant: KB Home; Defendant: KB Home Florida LLC; Defendant: KB Home Tampa LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less