This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 08/30/2023 at 16:26:29 (UTC).

COX, CLARA C - Estate

Case Summary

On 10/04/2022 COX, CLARA C - Estate was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Pomponio, Denise. A, Corvo, T. Vivian and Pomponio, A. Denise. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3607

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Pomponio, Denise. A

Corvo, T. Vivian

Pomponio, A. Denise

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court, Trustees and Petitioners

MUDRA, RONALD E

BAKER, WANDA

BEURMANN, RITA

BRENDLE, CAROLYN

BROWN, DULARIE FATIMA

CLARY, MICHAEL

CLARY, PAUL

COLLIER, DAYRA

COMPTON, BECKY WEBB

CUNNINGHAM, CAROLYN

HILL, RUTH

HILLSDALE BAPTIST CHURCH

HOSPICE OF TAMPA

HUMANE SOCIETY OF TAMPA BAY

HUNT, LAURA

JORDAN, JUANITA LODGE

KELLY, BARBARA

KELLY, CHRISTOPHER

KELLY, MICHAEL

Decedent

COX, CLARA C

17 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court, Trustee and Petitioner Attorney

WALTON , ROBERT SCOTT

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketCHANGE OF ADDRESS; Comment: ATTORNEY; Additional Info: Petitioning Attorney: WALTON , ROBERT SCOTT;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • DocketINVENTORY OF PERSONAL REP; Additional Info: Co-Personal Representative: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.; Petitioner: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.; Trustee: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • DocketNOTICE TO CREDITORS; Additional Info: Co-Personal Representative: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.; Petitioner: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.; Trustee: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT NO FLA EST TAX DUE; Additional Info: Co-Personal Representative: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.; Petitioner: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.; Trustee: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • DocketPET TO DET HOMESTEAD; Additional Info: Co-Personal Representative: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.; Petitioner: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.; Trustee: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • DocketNOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION; Additional Info: Co-Personal Representative: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.; Petitioner: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.; Trustee: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • DocketFORMAL NOTICE; Additional Info: Co-Personal Representative: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.; Petitioner: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.; Trustee: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketPROOF OF PUB OF NOTICE CREDITORS; Comment: 2/3, 2/10; Additional Info: Decedent: COX, CLARA C;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • HearingJAWS HEARING; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Hearing Location: 800 E. Twiggs St. Tampa, FL 33602 Room 412View Case Hearing Notice for Additional Details, as applicable.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketORDER ADMITTING WILL-APPT PR; Comment: CO-PR'S, BOND WAIVED; Additional Info: Co-Personal Representative: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.; Personal Representative: MUDRA, RONALD E; Petitioner: MUDRA, RONALD E; Petitioner: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.; Trustee: MUDRA, RONALD E; Trustee: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketLETTER TO CLERK FROM; Comment: ATTY WALTON; Additional Info: Co-Personal Representative: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.; Personal Representative: MUDRA, RONALD E; Petitioner: MUDRA, RONALD E; Petitioner: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.; Trustee: MUDRA, RONALD E; Trustee: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketFORMAL NOTICE; Additional Info: Co-Personal Representative: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.; Personal Representative: MUDRA, RONALD E; Petitioner: MUDRA, RONALD E; Petitioner: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.; Trustee: MUDRA, RONALD E; Trustee: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketPET FOR ADMIN-FLA RES W-WILL; Additional Info: Co-Personal Representative: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.; Personal Representative: MUDRA, RONALD E; Petitioner: MUDRA, RONALD E; Petitioner: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.; Trustee: MUDRA, RONALD E; Trustee: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketOATH, DESIGNATION & ACCEPTANCE; Comment: EDWIN W HOFFMAN, SR VP OF WELLS FARGO BK; Additional Info: Co-Personal Representative: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.; Personal Representative: MUDRA, RONALD E; Petitioner: MUDRA, RONALD E; Petitioner: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.; Trustee: MUDRA, RONALD E; Trustee: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketOATH, DESIGNATION & ACCEPTANCE; Comment: RONALD E MUDRA; Additional Info: Co-Personal Representative: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.; Personal Representative: MUDRA, RONALD E; Petitioner: MUDRA, RONALD E; Petitioner: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.; Trustee: MUDRA, RONALD E; Trustee: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE FILED; Additional Info: Co-Personal Representative: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.; Personal Representative: MUDRA, RONALD E; Petitioner: MUDRA, RONALD E; Petitioner: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.; Trustee: MUDRA, RONALD E; Trustee: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO RULE 2-420; Additional Info: Co-Personal Representative: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.; Personal Representative: MUDRA, RONALD E; Petitioner: MUDRA, RONALD E; Petitioner: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.; Trustee: MUDRA, RONALD E; Trustee: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Co-Personal Representative: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.; Personal Representative: MUDRA, RONALD E; Petitioner: MUDRA, RONALD E; Petitioner: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.; Trustee: MUDRA, RONALD E; Trustee: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRUST; Additional Info: Co-Personal Representative: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.; Personal Representative: MUDRA, RONALD E; Petitioner: MUDRA, RONALD E; Petitioner: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.; Trustee: MUDRA, RONALD E; Trustee: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less