Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 04/15/2021 at 00:42:42 (UTC).

CORYELL, WILLIAM J - Estate

Case Summary

On 03/21/2020 CORYELL, WILLIAM J - Estate was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Corvo, T. Vivian and Corvo, Vivian. T. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0880

  • Filing Date:

    03/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Corvo, T. Vivian

Corvo, Vivian. T

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court and Petitioners

HINES, JAMES P, Jr

Tampa, FL 33606

LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT OF WILLIAM J CORYELL DATED

Sun City Center, FL 33573

CORYELL, KATHARINA G

Sun City Center, FL 33573

SIMMONS, ROCHELLE ALEXANDRIA

Sun City Center, FL 33571

TRUST FOR KATHARINA G CORYELL

4846 Sun City Center Blvd Pmb 271

Sun City Center, FL 33573

TRUST FOR HEIDI R NIEBER

39442 County Rd 54

Zephyrhills, FL 33542

CORYELL, STEVEN JOHN

Tampa, FL 33635

TRUST FOR DEBORAH J RICH

39442 County Rd 54

Zephyrhills, FL 33542

Claimants

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

C/O Dcm Services 7601 Penn Ave S Suite A600

Minneapolis, MN 55423-5004

ASCENSIONPOINT RECOVERY SERVICES, LLC

O/B/O Comenity Bank- Victoria'S Secret 200 Coon Rapids Blvd Suite 200

Coon Rapids, MN 55433-5876

Decedent

CORYELL, WILLIAM J

Ruskin, FL 33570

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court and Petitioner Attorneys

HINES , JAMES PARKER, Jr

Attorney at HINES NORMAN HINES, P.L.

315 S Hyde Park Ave

Tampa, FL 33606

AMAN , JEFFREY ALLEN

Attorney at AMAN LAW FIRM

282 Crystal Grove Blvd

Lutz, FL 33548

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketPET TO EXT FINAL ACCT-PET DISC; Additional Info: Personal Representative: HINES, JAMES P, Jr; Petitioner: HINES, JAMES P, Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketPROOF OF SRVC NOTICE TO CREDTR; Comment: GM FINANCIAL LEASING; Additional Info: Personal Representative: HINES, JAMES P, Jr; Petitioner: HINES, JAMES P, Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Beneficiary: TRUST FOR HEIDI R NIEBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketPROOF OF SRVC NOTICE OF ADMIN; Comment: ROCHELLE ALEXANDRIA SIMMONS; Additional Info: Personal Representative: HINES, JAMES P, Jr; Petitioner: HINES, JAMES P, Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE; Additional Info: Personal Representative: HINES, JAMES P, Jr; Petitioner: HINES, JAMES P, Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketPROOF OF SRVC NOTICE TO CREDTR; Additional Info: Personal Representative: HINES, JAMES P, Jr; Petitioner: HINES, JAMES P, Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketPROOF OF SRVC NOTICE TO CREDTR; Additional Info: Personal Representative: HINES, JAMES P, Jr; Petitioner: HINES, JAMES P, Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE; Additional Info: Personal Representative: HINES, JAMES P, Jr; Petitioner: HINES, JAMES P, Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE; Additional Info: Personal Representative: HINES, JAMES P, Jr; Petitioner: HINES, JAMES P, Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE; Additional Info: Personal Representative: HINES, JAMES P, Jr; Petitioner: HINES, JAMES P, Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 04/13/2020
  • DocketLAST WILL-TESTAMENT-NOT ADMTD; Comment: CODICIL; Additional Info: Decedent: CORYELL, WILLIAM J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketMEMORANDUM; Comment: FROM ATTY FRIEDRICH, DATED 4/3/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE FILED; Comment: ORIGINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketOATH, DESIGNATION & ACCEPTANCE; Additional Info: Personal Representative: HINES, JAMES P, Jr; Petitioner: HINES, JAMES P, Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketLETTER TO CLERK FROM; Comment: 03/25/20; Additional Info: Petitioning Attorney: HINES , JAMES PARKER, Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2020
  • DocketPROBATE NEW CASE FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2020
  • DocketPET FOR ADMIN-FLA RES W-WILL; Additional Info: Personal Representative: HINES, JAMES P, Jr; Petitioner: HINES, JAMES P, Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT NO FLA EST TAX DUE; Additional Info: Personal Representative: HINES, JAMES P, Jr; Petitioner: HINES, JAMES P, Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO RULE 2-420; Additional Info: Personal Representative: HINES, JAMES P, Jr; Petitioner: HINES, JAMES P, Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2020
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE FILED; Additional Info: Personal Representative: HINES, JAMES P, Jr; Petitioner: HINES, JAMES P, Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ASCENSIONPOINT RECOVERY SERVICES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HINES , JAMES PARKER, Jr