Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 07/18/2021 at 01:34:47 (UTC).

CORREA, SANTIAGO vs TIRADO, NATALIA SANCHEZ

Case Summary

On 04/16/2021 CORREA, SANTIAGO filed a Family - Minor Custody lawsuit against TIRADO, NATALIA SANCHEZ. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Tibbals, Wesley. D, Tibbals, D. Wesley, Green, Gregory. G, Green, G Gregory and Green, G. Gregory. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5279

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Minor Custody

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Tibbals, Wesley. D

Tibbals, D. Wesley

Green, Gregory. G

Green, G Gregory

Green, G. Gregory

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CORREA, SANTIAGO

Riverview, FL 33578

Respondents

TIRADO, NATALIA SANCHEZ

CORREA VILLA, JUAN DAVID

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

FARREN , PETER MAWN

Attorney at VALRICO LAW GROUP, P.A.

3626 Erindale Dr

Valrico, FL 33596

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2021
  • HearingCase Management Conference; Cancelled Comments: Final Order Entered; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Hearing Location: COURTROOM 413 800 E TWIGGS TAMPA, FL 33602; Judicial Officer: Green, G Gregory

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketORDER GRANTING PETITION (FAMILY); Comment: ORDER GRANTING PETITION FOR CONCURRENT CUSTODY BY EXTENDED FAMILY; Additional Info: Petitioner: CORREA, SANTIAGO; Respondent: CORREA VILLA, JUAN DAVID; Respondent: TIRADO, NATALIA SANCHEZ; Date Signed: 05/05/2021; Judicial Officer: Green, G Gregory

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketCOPY OF IDENTIFICATION; Comment: FLORIDA DRIVER LICENSE; Additional Info: Petitioner: CORREA, SANTIAGO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketLETTER FROM CLERK; Comment: (RE: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO FILED 04/16/2021) - MAILED ATTYS AND PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketORDER SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketSTANDING TEMPORARY ORDER FOR FAMILY LAW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; Additional Info: Petitioner: CORREA, SANTIAGO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketSRS NEW CASE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Petitioner: CORREA, SANTIAGO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketPETITION FILED; Additional Info: Petitioner: CORREA, SANTIAGO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASE; Additional Info: Petitioner: CORREA, SANTIAGO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketUNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY AND JURISDICTION ACT; Additional Info: Petitioner: CORREA, SANTIAGO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO RULE 2-420; Additional Info: Petitioner: CORREA, SANTIAGO

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FARREN , PETER MAWN