This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 03/10/2023 at 08:24:18 (UTC).

Cornerstone Mobile Glass LLC vs USAA Casualty Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 12/04/2022 Cornerstone Mobile Glass LLC filed an Other lawsuit against USAA Casualty Insurance Company. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Schultz-Kin, Leslie, Valkenburg, V.. Miriam and Valkenburg, Miriam. V.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6818

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Schultz-Kin, Leslie

Valkenburg, V.. Miriam

Valkenburg, Miriam. V.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Cornerstone Mobile Glass LLC

5331 Primrose Lake Circle

Tampa, FL 33647

WRIGHT, ANTHONY D

Defendant

USAA Casualty Insurance Company

9800 Fredericksburg Road

San Antonio, TX 78288

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCMILLAN , MARK A

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF LIU & ASSOCIATES, P.A.

5050 W Colonial Dr

Orlando, FL 32808

Defendant Attorney

TOBIN , LEE ANDREW

Attorney at BANKER LOPEZ GASSLER P.A.

360 Central Ave Ste 700

St Petersburg, FL 33701

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

12/04/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

12/04/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/04/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

12/06/2022: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

12/06/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

12/09/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

12/19/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME

12/29/2022: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME

MOTION TO STAY

12/29/2022: MOTION TO STAY

MOTION TO DISMISS

12/29/2022: MOTION TO DISMISS

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS; Comment: COMPLAINT/STATEMENT OF CLAIM, MOTION TO STRIKE ALLEGATIONS OF COMPLAINT/STATEMENT OF CLAIM, AND MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT; Additional Info: Defendant: USAA Casualty Insurance Company; Private Attorney: TOBIN , LEE ANDREW;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO STAY; Comment: PENDING RULING ON DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS, STRIKE AND FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT AND MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER; Additional Info: Defendant: USAA Casualty Insurance Company; Private Attorney: TOBIN , LEE ANDREW;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME; Comment: TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY; Additional Info: Defendant: USAA Casualty Insurance Company; Private Attorney: TOBIN , LEE ANDREW;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: USAA Casualty Insurance Company;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS; Comment: USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY 12/9/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: USAA Casualty Insurance Company;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Cornerstone Mobile Glass LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Cornerstone Mobile Glass LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Cornerstone Mobile Glass LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2022
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Cornerstone Mobile Glass LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Cornerstone Mobile Glass LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less