This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 01/20/2022 at 22:20:24 (UTC).

Cornerstone Integrated Healthcare, LLC vs Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 10/18/2021 Cornerstone Integrated Healthcare, LLC filed an Other - Declaratory Judgment lawsuit against Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Hooi, J. Michael and Hooi, Michael. J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5229

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Declaratory Judgment

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Hooi, J. Michael

Hooi, Michael. J

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Cornerstone Integrated Healthcare, LLC

1380 N. University Drive Suite 200

Plantation, FL 33322

BURKE, SUSAN

Defendant

Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company

Po Box 4009

Seminole, FL 33775

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DALY , JOHN CHRISTOPHER, Jr

Attorney at DALY & BARBER, PA

8551 W Sunrise Blvd Ste 304

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33322

Defendant Attorney

PARRINO , ANTHONY JOSEPH

Attorney at REYNOLDS PARRINO SHADWICK, P.A,

8950 Dr Martin Luther King Jr St N Ste 220

Saint Petersburg, FL 33702

 

Court Documents

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

10/18/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

10/18/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/18/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

Streamlined Differentiated Case Management Order

10/21/2021: Streamlined Differentiated Case Management Order

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

10/24/2021: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

11/08/2021: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

11/08/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

11/08/2021: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

LETTER FROM CLERK

10/24/2021: LETTER FROM CLERK

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

12/09/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

12/20/2021: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

12/09/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

12/20/2021: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Defendant: Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Comment: PLAINTIFF'S FIRST; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Cornerstone Integrated Healthcare, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Comment: PLAINTIFF'S - FIRST; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Cornerstone Integrated Healthcare, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Comment: PLAINTIFF'S FIRST; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Cornerstone Integrated Healthcare, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Comment: PLAINTIFF'S - ADJUSTER CODE OF ETHICS - ATTACHED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Cornerstone Integrated Healthcare, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Comment: REQUEST OF DEPOSITIONS OF ADJUSTERS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Cornerstone Integrated Healthcare, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketCASE TRANSFERRED TO DIVISION N PER AO S-2021-057

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER FROM CLERK; Comment: RE: ADDITIONAL FILING FEE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Cornerstone Integrated Healthcare, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStreamlined Differentiated Case Management Order; Additional Info: Defendant: Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company; Plaintiff: BURKE, SUSAN; Plaintiff: Cornerstone Integrated Healthcare, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketStreamline Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Cornerstone Integrated Healthcare, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Cornerstone Integrated Healthcare, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Cornerstone Integrated Healthcare, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Cornerstone Integrated Healthcare, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CORNERSTONE INTEGRATED HEALTHCARE, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daly, John C, Jr.