This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 07/26/2022 at 15:14:53 (UTC).

Copper Ridge/Brandon Homeowners Association Inc vs Hickman, Sidney L

Case Summary

On 05/12/2022 Copper Ridge/Brandon Homeowners Association Inc filed an Other lawsuit against Hickman, Sidney L. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Costello, Jessica. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1126

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Costello, Jessica

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Copper RidgeBrandon Homeowners Association Inc

2111 W Swann Ave Suite 204

Tampa, FL 33606

Copper Ridge/Brandon Homeowners Association Inc

2111 W Swann Ave Suite 204

Tampa, FL 33606

Defendant

Hickman, Sidney L

Valrico, FL 33594

 

Court Documents

NOTICE

05/12/2022: NOTICE

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

05/12/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

05/12/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

LIS PENDENS

05/12/2022: LIS PENDENS

NOTICE

05/12/2022: NOTICE

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/12/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

LIS PENDENS (RECORDABLE)

05/13/2022: LIS PENDENS (RECORDABLE)

General Differentiated Case Management Order

05/13/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

05/13/2022: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS RETURNED SUBSTITUTE SERVICE

05/20/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED SUBSTITUTE SERVICE

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

06/23/2022: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SERVICE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Copper Ridge/Brandon Homeowners Association Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SUBSTITUTE SERVICE; Comment: (20 DAYS) 5/18/2022 DEFT SIDNEY L HICKMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Hickman, Sidney L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS (RECORDABLE); Additional Info: Defendant: Hickman, Sidney L; Plaintiff: Copper Ridge/Brandon Homeowners Association Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: ENTERED IN ERROR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Copper Ridge/Brandon Homeowners Association Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Copper Ridge/Brandon Homeowners Association Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Copper Ridge/Brandon Homeowners Association Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Copper Ridge/Brandon Homeowners Association Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Copper Ridge/Brandon Homeowners Association Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Copper Ridge/Brandon Homeowners Association Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Copper Ridge/Brandon Homeowners Association Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Copper Ridge/Brandon Homeowner`s Association, Inc is a litigant