Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 02/19/2021 at 21:08:41 (UTC).

CopaSAT, LLC vs Tampa Microwave, LLC

Case Summary

On 03/28/2019 CopaSAT, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Tampa Microwave, LLC. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Thomas, K. Cheryl, Stephens, Scott. Steven, Farfante, D. Darren and Farfante, Darren. D. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3263

  • Filing Date:

    03/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Thomas, K. Cheryl

Stephens, Scott. Steven

Farfante, D. Darren

Farfante, Darren. D

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CopaSAT, LLC

1604 N. Marion Street

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendants

Telecommunication Systems, Inc.

Corporation Service Company 1201 Hays Street

Tallahassee, FL 32301

Tampa Microwave, LLC

11200 Dr. Martin Luther King Jr. St. N

St. Petersburg, FL 33716

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ULIANO , AMANDA M.

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF AMANDA M. ULIANO, P.A.

400 N Ashley Dr Ste 1100

Tampa, FL 33602

MARTINEZ-MONFORT , LUIS

Attorney at GARDNER BREWER MARTINEZ-MONFORT, P.A.

400 N Ashley Dr Ste 1100

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendant Attorneys

TRIGGS , MATTHEW HENRY

Attorney at PROSKAUER ROSE LLP

2255 Glades Rd Ste 421A

Boca Raton, FL 33431

HECK, DAVID W

Eleven Times Square

New York, NY 10036

PICON, DAVID A

Eleven Times Square

New York, NY 10036

BARUCH , JASON H

Attorney at HOLLAND & KNIGHT, LLP

100 N Tampa St Ste 4100

Tampa, FL 33602

BARUCH , JASON HENRY

Attorney at HOLLAND & KNIGHT, LLP

100 N Tampa St Ste 4100

Tampa, FL 33602

SAMUELS, MICHAEL

601 Massachusetts Ave, N.W.

Washington, DC 20001

TURNER, STUART W

601 Massachusetts Ave, N.W.

Washington, DC 20001

 

Court Documents

ORDER SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

02/03/2021: ORDER SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

ANSWER AND DEFENSES OF

02/26/2020: ANSWER AND DEFENSES OF

AMENDED ANSWER

02/19/2020: AMENDED ANSWER

AMENDED COMPLAINT

02/07/2020: AMENDED COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF HEARING

11/05/2019: NOTICE OF HEARING

AGREED ORDER

07/23/2019: AGREED ORDER

NOTICE OF HEARING

08/06/2019: NOTICE OF HEARING

MOTION TO DISMISS

05/06/2019: MOTION TO DISMISS

MOTION TO DISMISS

04/17/2019: MOTION TO DISMISS

AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING

06/24/2019: AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF HEARING

06/06/2019: NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF HEARING

04/23/2019: NOTICE OF HEARING

20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

04/15/2019: 20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

03/28/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

03/28/2019: COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

03/28/2019: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2021
  • JudgementJudgment Code: OAS; Judgment Description: ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION; Instrument Number: 2021066165; Judge: Farfante, Darren D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketORDER APPROVING STIPULATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Comment: 03/11/21 AT 1:30 PM 02/03/21 DDF; Additional Info: Defendant: Tampa Microwave, LLC; Defendant: Telecommunication Systems, Inc.; Plaintiff: CopaSAT, LLC; Private Attorney: BARUCH , JASON H; Private Attorney: MARTINEZ-MONFORT , LUIS; Private Attorney: TRIGGS , MATTHEW HENRY; Date Signed: 02/03/2021; Judicial Officer: Farfante, Darren D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketREPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: CopaSAT, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND DEFENSES OF; Comment: TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Defendant: Tampa Microwave, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketSTIPULATION OF DISMISSAL; Comment: **JOINT** BY AND BETWEEN COPASAT, LLC AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS SYSTEMS, INC; Additional Info: Defendant: Telecommunication Systems, Inc.; Plaintiff: CopaSAT, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED ANSWER; Comment: DEFENDANT TAMPA MICROWAVE'S ANSWER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Defendant: Tampa Microwave, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED COMPLAINT; Comment: COS 02/07/2020 / EXHIBITS ATTACHED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: CopaSAT, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Comment: TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: CopaSAT, LLC; Date 2: 02/05/2020; Judicial Officer: Stephens, Steven Scott

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketMOTION TO EXTEND; Comment: TIME TO FILE AMDENDED COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: CopaSAT, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
40 More Docket Entries
  • 04/15/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF PROCESS; Comment: TELECOMMUNICATION SYSYTEMS INC., C/O CSC- LAWYERS INCORP. SERVICE COMPANY - 4/1/19 - REGISTERED AGENT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: CopaSAT, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: TAMPA MICROWAVE LLC C/O REGISTERED AGENT, CORPORATION SERVICE COMPANY 4/1/19; Additional Info: Plaintiff: CopaSAT, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X2 darthur@gbmmlaw.com; Additional Info: Defendant: Tampa Microwave, LLC; Defendant: Telecommunication Systems, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X2 darthur@gbmmlaw.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: CopaSAT, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: CopaSAT, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: CopaSAT, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: CopaSAT, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: CopaSAT, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Telecommunication Systems, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ULIANO , AMANDA M.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Martinez-Monfort, Luis