This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 08/17/2022 at 21:08:09 (UTC).

Conforti Chiropractic And Wellness Center, Inc,COOK, DYLAN vs Government Employees Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 07/01/2022 Conforti Chiropractic And Wellness Center, Inc,COOK, DYLAN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Government Employees Insurance Company. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Murphy, J. Logan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7064

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Murphy, J. Logan

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Conforti Chiropractic And Wellness Center, Inc

3705 North Himes Avenue

Tampa, FL 33607

COOK, DYLAN

Defendant

Government Employees Insurance Company

200 East Gaines St.

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SMITH , DANIEL B

Attorney at MORGAN AND MORGAN

3705 N Himes Ave

Tampa, FL 33607

Defendant Attorney

DOUMAS , JENNIFER MARIE

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF DAVID S. DOUGHERTY

4300 W Cypress St Ste 900

Tampa, FL 33607

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

07/01/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

07/01/2022: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

07/01/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

07/01/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE

07/01/2022: NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

07/01/2022: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/01/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

07/05/2022: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

07/05/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

07/15/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

08/04/2022: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

08/04/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOT OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

08/04/2022: NOT OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

08/04/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

08/04/2022: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Defendant: Government Employees Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: Government Employees Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOT OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Defendant: Government Employees Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Defendant: Government Employees Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Defendant: Government Employees Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Government Employees Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Conforti Chiropractic And Wellness Center, Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Conforti Chiropractic And Wellness Center, Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Conforti Chiropractic And Wellness Center, Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COMPLIANCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Conforti Chiropractic And Wellness Center, Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Conforti Chiropractic And Wellness Center, Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Conforti Chiropractic And Wellness Center, Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Conforti Chiropractic And Wellness Center, Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Conforti Chiropractic And Wellness Center, Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CONFORTI CHIROPRACTIC AND WELLNESS CENTER, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Government Employees Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SMITH , DANIEL B