This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 09/16/2021 at 04:21:45 (UTC).

Compton Chiropractic Care L.L.C.,Hand, Jeanneann vs Geico General Insurance Company, a foreign corporation

Case Summary

On 06/30/2021 Compton Chiropractic Care L L C ,Hand, Jeanneann filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Geico General Insurance Company, a foreign corporation. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Murphy, J. Logan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2600

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Murphy, J. Logan

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Compton Chiropractic Care L.L.C.

121 West Forsyth

Jacksonville, FL 32202

Hand, Jeanneann

Defendants

Geico General Insurance Company

200 E. Gaines Street

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Geico General Insurance Company, a foreign corporation

C/O Florida Chief Financial Officer 200 E. Gaines Street

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CAGAN , JONATHAN JAMES

Attorney at CAGAN & CAGAN PLLC

121 W Forsyth St Ste 810

Jacksonville, FL 32202-3857

Defendant Attorney

PAFITES , ANDREW JOSEPH GEORGE, Jr

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF DAVID S. DOUGHERTY

4300 W Cypress St Ste 900

Tampa, FL 33607

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

07/29/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

07/01/2021: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

07/01/2021: General Differentiated Case Management Order

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/30/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

06/30/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

06/30/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Compton Chiropractic Care L.L.C.; Plaintiff: Hand, Jeanneann; Private Attorney: CAGAN , JONATHAN JAMES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME; Comment: TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT'S DISCOVERY AND OBJECTIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Compton Chiropractic Care L.L.C.; Plaintiff: Hand, Jeanneann; Private Attorney: CAGAN , JONATHAN JAMES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME; Additional Info: Defendant: Geico General Insurance Company, a foreign corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketMOTION TO - FOR; Comment: RELIEF FROM TECHNICAL ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Defendant: Geico General Insurance Company, a foreign corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Defendant: Geico General Insurance Company, a foreign corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Comment: DISCLOSURE, AND DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Defendant: Geico General Insurance Company, a foreign corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Comment: DISCLOSURE, AND DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Comment: AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; Additional Info: Defendant: Geico General Insurance Company, a foreign corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Comment: AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Defendant: Geico General Insurance Company, a foreign corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Compton Chiropractic Care L.L.C.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Compton Chiropractic Care L.L.C.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Compton Chiropractic Care L.L.C.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Compton Chiropractic Care L.L.C.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Compton Chiropractic Care L.L.C.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Compton Chiropractic Care L.L.C.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Compton Chiropractic Care L.L.C.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Compton Chiropractic Care L.L.C., is a litigant

Latest cases where GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PAFITES , ANDREW JOSEPH GEORGE, Jr