This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 07/01/2022 at 01:45:28 (UTC).

Columna, Inc.,Russom, Jeffrey vs Allstate Fire And Casualty Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 04/19/2022 Columna, Inc ,Russom, Jeffrey filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Allstate Fire And Casualty Insurance Company. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Schultz-Kin, Leslie. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5188

  • Filing Date:

    04/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Schultz-Kin, Leslie

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Columna, Inc. A/A/O Jeffrey Russom

3705 North Himes Avenue

Tampa, FL 33607

Columna, Inc.

3705 North Himes Avenue

Tampa, FL 33607

Russom, Jeffrey

Defendant

Allstate Fire And Casualty Insurance Company

200 East Gaines St.

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SMITH , DANIEL B

Attorney at MORGAN AND MORGAN

3705 N Himes Ave

Tampa, FL 33607

Defendant Attorney

PARRINO , ANTHONY JOSEPH

Attorney at REYNOLDS PARRINO SHADWICK, P.A,

8950 Dr Martin Luther King Jr St N Ste 220

Saint Petersburg, FL 33702

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

04/19/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

04/19/2022: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

04/19/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

04/19/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE

04/19/2022: NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

04/19/2022: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/19/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

04/21/2022: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

04/21/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

04/28/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

05/09/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

06/17/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

06/17/2022: RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

06/17/2022: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Defendant: Allstate Fire And Casualty Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Defendant: Allstate Fire And Casualty Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES; Comment: UNVERIFIED ; Additional Info: Defendant: Allstate Fire And Casualty Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: Allstate Fire And Casualty Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Allstate Fire And Casualty Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Columna, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Columna, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Columna, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COMPLIANCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Columna, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Columna, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Columna, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Columna, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Columna, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COLUMNA, INC./THOMAS ROUSH M.D. A/A/O BANI GOMEZ is a litigant

Latest cases where Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SMITH , DANIEL B