Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 05/12/2021 at 05:41:49 (UTC).

Colagiovanni, Kelly vs GPR Mckinley Manager, LLC

Case Summary

On 01/28/2021 Colagiovanni, Kelly filed an Other lawsuit against GPR Mckinley Manager, LLC. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Huey, L. Paul and Huey, Paul. L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0775

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Huey, L. Paul

Huey, Paul. L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Colagiovanni, Kelly

Tampa, FL 33606

Defendants

GPR Mckinley Manager, LLC

180 S. Knowles Ave Suite 3

Winter Park, FL 32789

McKinley Companies Inc

320 N. Main St. Suite 200

Ann Arbor, MI 48104

Manhattan Flats, LLC

320 N. Main St. Suite 200

Ann Arbor, MI 48104

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BARNES , STEPHEN ASHLEY

Attorney at BARNES TRIAL GROUP

505 S Magnolia Ave

Tampa, FL 33606

Defendant Attorney

BENSON, NICOLE DIANE

Attorney at COLE, SCOTT & KISSANE, P.A.

4301 W Boy Scout Blvd Ste 400

Tampa, FL 33607

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

02/11/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/28/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

01/28/2021: COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

01/28/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

01/28/2021: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

01/28/2021: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

01/28/2021: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketPRIVILEGE LOG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Colagiovanni, Kelly

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Colagiovanni, Kelly

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Colagiovanni, Kelly

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Colagiovanni, Kelly

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Colagiovanni, Kelly

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Colagiovanni, Kelly

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Colagiovanni, Kelly

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X3; Additional Info: Defendant: GPR Mckinley Manager, LLC; Defendant: Manhattan Flats, LLC; Defendant: McKinley Companies Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X3

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Manhattan Flats, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where McKinley Companies Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BARNES , STEPHEN ASHLEY