This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 12/02/2019 at 12:20:18 (UTC).

Clogston, Christopher vsWal-mart and Walmart Stores Inc.

Case Summary

On 01/16/2019 Clogston, Christopher vsWal-mart and Walmart Stores Inc was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Nielsen, A. Richard. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0513

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Nielsen, A. Richard

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Clogston, Christopher

Beverly Hills, FL 34465

Defendants

Wal-mart and Walmart Stores Inc.

1200 South Pine Island Rd.

Plantation, FL 33324

Sedgwick CMS

Plantation, FL 33324

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZAKARIA , JODI ANN

Attorney at DEUTSCHMAN & ZAKARIA

305 N Apopka Ave

Inverness, FL 34450

Defendant Attorney

JUSTIN , BEATRIZ ELIZABETH

Attorney at RISSMAN BARRETT HURT DONAHUE & MCLAIN P A

1 N Dale Mabry Hwy Fl 11

Tampa, FL 33609

 

Court Documents

SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE

02/18/2019: SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE

RESPONSE

02/05/2019: RESPONSE

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

01/30/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

01/30/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

01/25/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

ORDER SETTING HEARING

01/22/2019: ORDER SETTING HEARING

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

01/17/2019: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

01/17/2019: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/16/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

01/16/2019: COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

01/16/2019: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

01/16/2019: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

01/16/2019: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/27/2019
  • JOINT STIPULATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • NOTICE OF CANCELLATION; Comment: OF HEARING; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Clogston, Christopher; Private Attorney: ZAKARIA , JODI ANN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE; Additional Info: Defendant: Sedgwick CMS; Defendant: Wal-mart and Walmart Stores Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • RESPONSE; Comment: TP PETITION FOR RULE NISI; Additional Info: Defendant: Sedgwick CMS; Defendant: Wal-mart and Walmart Stores Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: SEDGWICK CMS, 1/18/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: WAL-MART AND WALMART STORES INC, 1/18/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: Sedgwick CMS; Defendant: Wal-mart and Walmart Stores Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • ORDER SETTING HEARING; Comment: ON PLAINTIFF'S PETITION FOR ISSUANCE OF RULE NISI HEARING ON 03/04/19 AT 10:00 AM 01/22/19 RAN; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Clogston, Christopher; Date 2: 01/22/2019; Judicial Officer: Nielsen, Richard A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X2 - dandzlaw@gmail.com ; efile@dnzlaw.com ; Additional Info: Defendant: Sedgwick CMS; Defendant: Wal-mart and Walmart Stores Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X2 - dandzlaw@gmail.com ; efile@dnzlaw.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • File Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Clogston, Christopher

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT; Comment: PETITION FOR ISSUANCE OF RULE NISI; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Clogston, Christopher

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Clogston, Christopher

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Clogston, Christopher

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Clogston, Christopher

    Read MoreRead Less