This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 05/05/2022 at 21:17:51 (UTC).

Clearview Open Mri, vs 21St Century Centennial Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 08/31/2021 Clearview Open Mri filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against 21St Century Centennial Insurance Company. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Hooi, J. Michael, Hooi, Michael. J, Ober, Joelle. Ann and Ober, Ann. Joelle. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2210

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Hooi, J. Michael

Hooi, Michael. J

Ober, Joelle. Ann

Ober, Ann. Joelle

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Clearview Open Mri, As Assignee Of, H. Castillo

Tampa, FL 33606

CASTILLO, H.

Clearview Open Mri,

Tampa, FL 33606

Defendant

21St Century Centennial Insurance Company

200 East Gaines St.

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CALKIN , CHRISTOPHER P

Attorney at THE LAW OFFICE OF CHRISTOPHER P. CALKIN P.A.

808 W De Leon St

Tampa, FL 33606

Defendant Attorney

EASTERLING , TAISHA

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF SANABRIA & MARSH

Employees Of Farmers Insurance Exchange 2290 Lucien Way Ste 280

Maitland, FL 32751

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

08/31/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

08/31/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

09/02/2021: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

08/31/2021: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

08/31/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

08/31/2021: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

08/31/2021: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

General Differentiated Case Management Order

09/02/2021: General Differentiated Case Management Order

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

01/10/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME

03/03/2022: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME

MOTION TO DISMISS

03/08/2022: MOTION TO DISMISS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

03/08/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

03/08/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: 21St Century Centennial Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS; Comment: PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM UPON WHICH RELIEF MAY BE GRANTED; Additional Info: Defendant: 21St Century Centennial Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME; Comment: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Defendant: 21St Century Centennial Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketCASE TRANSFERRED TO DIVISION N PER AO S-2021-057

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: 21St Century Centennial Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Clearview Open Mri,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Clearview Open Mri,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Clearview Open Mri,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Clearview Open Mri,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Clearview Open Mri,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Clearview Open Mri,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Clearview Open Mri,

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 21st Century Centennial Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CALKIN , CHRISTOPHER P