This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 11/27/2021 at 07:02:48 (UTC).

CLARK, TIFFANY vs ANDREU, ANTHONY

Case Summary

On 05/04/2021 CLARK, TIFFANY filed a Family - Domestic Partnership Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against ANDREU, ANTHONY. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Old Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Weis, Richard. A, Weis, A. Richard and Weis, Richard A. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6163

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Domestic Partnership Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Weis, Richard. A

Weis, A. Richard

Weis, Richard A

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CLARK, TIFFANY

Seffner, FL 33584

Respondent

ANDREU, ANTHONY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketPAPER CASE FILE DESTROYED - DIGITIZED; Comment: Paper document converted to electronic image(s) destroyed per requirements set forth in Rules of Judicial Administration 2.525(c)(2)(B); (c)(2)(F); and (c)(4). PC DV

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketCOPY OF ORDER SENT TO PETITIONER VIA TEXT/EMAIL; Comment: IPRS-INJUNCTION PETITION RETURNED SERVED; Additional Info: Petitioner: CLARK, TIFFANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketINJUNCTION PETITION RETURNED SERVED; Comment: FINAL INJUNCTION, FINAL, STALKING; Additional Info: Respondent: ANDREU, ANTHONY; Date Served: 08/26/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON SERVICE; Comment: FINAL INJUNCTION, FINAL, STALKING; Additional Info: Respondent: ANDREU, ANTHONY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketCOPY OF ORDER SENT TO PETITIONER VIA TEXT/EMAIL; Comment: AONS-AFFIDAVIT OF NON SERVICE; Additional Info: Petitioner: CLARK, TIFFANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketMAIL RETURNED BY POST OFFICE; Comment: FINAL JUDGMENT OF INJUNCTION; Additional Info: Petitioner: CLARK, TIFFANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • HearingTemporary Injunction Hearing; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Hearing Location: PLANT CITY COURTHOUSE, COURTROOM 3 301 N MICHIGAN AVE PLANT CITY, FL 33563; Judicial Officer: Weis, Richard A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketCOURT DOCKET PAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT INJUNCTION DOMESTIC VIOLENCE WITHOUT CHILDREN; Comment: 5 YEARS-EXPIRES 5/18/2026; Additional Info: Petitioner: CLARK, TIFFANY; Respondent: ANDREU, ANTHONY; Date Signed: 05/18/2021; Judicial Officer: Weis, Richard A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketSHERIFF INFORMATION SHEET; Comment: FINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketSTAY AWAY FROM; Comment: 11011 N US 301 THONOTOSASSA, FL 33592

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketJUDGE'S INSTRUCTIONS-INFORMATION ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketCOPY OF ORDER SENT TO PETITIONER VIA TEXT/EMAIL; Comment: PFIN-PETITION FOR INJUNCTION; Additional Info: Petitioner: CLARK, TIFFANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketCOPY OF ORDER SENT TO PETITIONER VIA TEXT/EMAIL; Comment: ACK-ACKNOWLEDGEMENT; Additional Info: Petitioner: CLARK, TIFFANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketCOPY OF ORDER SENT TO PETITIONER VIA TEXT/EMAIL; Comment: PCCS-PETITIONER COPY COVERSHEET; Additional Info: Petitioner: CLARK, TIFFANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketRESPONDENT BROCHURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketTEMPORARY INJUNCTION WITHOUT CHILD(REN); Additional Info: Petitioner: CLARK, TIFFANY; Respondent: ANDREU, ANTHONY; Date Signed: 05/04/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketCOPY OF ORDER SENT TO PETITIONER VIA TEXT/EMAIL; Comment: JIIO-JUDGE'S INSTRUCTIONS-INFORMATION ONLY; Additional Info: Petitioner: CLARK, TIFFANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER SENT TO PETITIONER VIA TEXT/EMAIL; Comment: TIWOC-TEMPORARY INJUNCTION WITHOUT CHILD(REN); Additional Info: Petitioner: CLARK, TIFFANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketEMAIL SENT TO HCSO CIVIL PROCESSING UNIT

    Read MoreRead Less