This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 03/13/2023 at 12:49:41 (UTC).

Clark, Rachel vs LTCSP - PLANT CITY LLC

Case Summary

On 10/24/2022 Clark, Rachel filed an Other lawsuit against LTCSP - PLANT CITY LLC. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Tesche Arkin, Caroline. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8884

  • Filing Date:

    10/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Tesche Arkin, Caroline

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Clark, Rachel

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendant

LTCSP - PLANT CITY LLC

2202 West Oak Avenue

Plant City, FL 33567

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FERRERA , ALBERT JACK

Attorney at MORGAN & MORGAN

201 N Franklin St

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

10/24/2022: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

Extended Differentiated Case Management Order

10/24/2022: Extended Differentiated Case Management Order

COMPLAINT

10/24/2022: COMPLAINT

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

10/24/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

10/24/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/24/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

10/26/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVICE

10/26/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE

MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

11/17/2022: MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

OBJECTION

12/15/2022: OBJECTION

OBJECTION

12/15/2022: OBJECTION

JOINT STIPULATION

03/09/2023: JOINT STIPULATION

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2023
  • HearingDifferentiated Case Management; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Hearing Location: WEBEX NUMBER 904-900-2303 ENTER ACCESS CODE: 132 878 9681; Judicial Officer: Tesche Arkin, Caroline

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJOINT STIPULATION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Clark, Rachel; Private Attorney: FERRERA , ALBERT JACK;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOBJECTION; Additional Info: Defendant: LTCSP - PLANT CITY LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOBJECTION; Additional Info: Defendant: LTCSP - PLANT CITY LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Clark, Rachel; Private Attorney: FERRERA , ALBERT JACK;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Clark, Rachel; Private Attorney: FERRERA , ALBERT JACK;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Clark, Rachel; Private Attorney: FERRERA , ALBERT JACK;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketExtended Differentiated Case Management Applies

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Defendant: LTCSP - PLANT CITY LLC; Plaintiff: Clark, Rachel;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Defendant: LTCSP - PLANT CITY LLC; Plaintiff: Clark, Rachel;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: LTCSP - PLANT CITY LLC; Plaintiff: Clark, Rachel;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Defendant: LTCSP - PLANT CITY LLC; Plaintiff: Clark, Rachel;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketExtended Differentiated Case Management Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X1; Additional Info: Defendant: LTCSP - PLANT CITY LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less