This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 05/05/2022 at 20:13:35 (UTC).

CK ASSESSORS, LLC. vs HERITAGE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/20/2022 CK ASSESSORS, LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HERITAGE PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Bagge-Hernandez, Michael. C, Bagge-Hernandez, Michael C and Bagge-Hernandez, C. Michael. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4037

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Bagge-Hernandez, Michael. C

Bagge-Hernandez, Michael C

Bagge-Hernandez, C. Michael

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CK ASSESSORS, LLC. A/A/O OLGA BELLO

2750 Sw 145Th Avenue Suite 509

Miramar, FL 33027

BELLO, OLGA

CK ASSESSORS, LLC.

2750 Sw 145Th Avenue Suite 509

Miramar, FL 33027

QUINTANA, PEDRO

Defendant

HERITAGE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

2600 Mccormick Drive Suite 300

Clearwater, FL 33759

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MOLINA , MARIO I.

Attorney at PROPERTY LITIGATION GROUP, PLLC

2750 Sw 145Th Ave Ste 509

Miramar, FL 33027

Defendant Attorney

JONES , DENNIS LEE

Attorney at HERITAGE INSURANCE

1401N N West Shore Blvd

Tampa, FL 33607

 

Court Documents

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

01/20/2022: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

01/20/2022: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

01/20/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/20/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/20/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

01/24/2022: E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

01/27/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

02/09/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

02/09/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE

02/16/2022: NOTICE

DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

03/15/2022: DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

COURT TICKET

03/15/2022: COURT TICKET

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

05/04/2022: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2022
  • JudgementJudgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2022231810; Judge: Bagge-Hernandez, Michael C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Additional Info: Plaintiff: CK ASSESSORS, LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • HearingPRETRIAL; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Hearing Location: COURTROOM 304 3RD FL 800 E TWIGGS ST TAMPA, FL 33602; Judicial Officer: Bagge-Hernandez, Michael C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT TICKET; Comment: PRETRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK; Comment: AT PRETRIAL; Additional Info: Defendant: HERITAGE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE; Comment: OF CHANGE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION; Additional Info: Defendant: HERITAGE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: HERITAGE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: CK ASSESSORS, LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET; Additional Info: Defendant: HERITAGE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: CK ASSESSORS, LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: CK ASSESSORS, LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: CK ASSESSORS, LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: CK ASSESSORS, LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: CK ASSESSORS, LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CK ASSESSORS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Heritage Property & Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Molina, Mario I