This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 09/18/2021 at 00:36:15 (UTC).

Citibank N.A. vs Griffiths, Timothy

Case Summary

On 07/01/2021 Citibank N A filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Griffiths, Timothy. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Costello, Jessica. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3552

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Costello, Jessica

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Citibank N.A.

6413 Congress Avenue Suite 150

Boca Raton, FL 33487

Defendant

Griffiths, Timothy

Riverview, FL 33569-4771

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LINEN , DREW RICHARD

Attorney at RAS LAVRAR LLC

Po Box 19039

Plantation, FL 33318

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

07/15/2021: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

07/07/2021: E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/01/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

07/01/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2021
  • HearingPRETRIAL; Hearing Time: 02:00 PM; Hearing Location: COURTROOM 303 800 E TWIGGS ST TAMPA, FL 33602; Judicial Officer: Costello, Jessica

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: TIMOTHY GRIFFITHS 07/13/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET; Additional Info: Defendant: Griffiths, Timothy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Citibank N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Citibank N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Citibank N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO RULE 2-420; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Citibank N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketNOTICE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Citibank N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Citibank N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CitiBank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LINEN, DREW RICHARD