This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 09/16/2021 at 21:46:48 (UTC).

CITIBANK NA vs FUENTES CABELLO, YOAN

Case Summary

On 07/16/2021 CITIBANK NA filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against FUENTES CABELLO, YOAN. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Costello, Jessica. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7831

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Costello, Jessica

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITIBANK NA

5800 South Corporate Place

Sioux Falls, SD 57108

Defendant

FUENTES CABELLO, YOAN

Tampa, FL 33619-5634

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MORALES , MAIRIM ANAID

Attorney at PATRICK A. CAREY, PA

10967 Lake Underhill Rd Ste 125

Orlando, FL 32825

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

08/11/2021: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

07/19/2021: E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

07/16/2021: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/16/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

07/16/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

07/16/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2021
  • HearingPRETRIAL; Hearing Time: 02:00 PM; Hearing Location: COURTROOM 303 800 E TWIGGS ST TAMPA, FL 33602; Judicial Officer: Costello, Jessica

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: 07-23-21; Additional Info: Plaintiff: CITIBANK NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET; Additional Info: Defendant: FUENTES CABELLO, YOAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: CITIBANK NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: CITIBANK NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: CITIBANK NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: CITIBANK NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CitiBank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MAIRIM A MORALES, ESQ