This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 09/23/2021 at 01:41:14 (UTC).

Citibank, N.A. vs Callawood, Ken

Case Summary

On 07/16/2021 Citibank, N A filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Callawood, Ken. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Bagge-Hernandez, C. Michael, Bagge-Hernandez, Michael. C and Bagge-Hernandez, Michael C. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8052

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Bagge-Hernandez, C. Michael

Bagge-Hernandez, Michael. C

Bagge-Hernandez, Michael C

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Citibank, N.A.

Po Box 44718

Jacksonville, FL 32247

Defendant

Callawood, Ken

Temple Terrace, FL 33637-3006

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DEBSKI , MICHAEL THIEL

Attorney at DEBSKI & ASSOCIATES, P.A.

Po Box 47718

Jacksonville, FL 32247

 

Court Documents

E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

07/19/2021: E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/16/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

07/16/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2021
  • HearingPRETRIAL; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Hearing Location: COURTROOM 304 3RD FL 800 E TWIGGS ST TAMPA, FL 33602; Judicial Officer: Bagge-Hernandez, Michael C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketORDER; Comment: ZOOM NOTICE AND POSSIBLE WAIVER OF APPEARANCE AT SMALL CLAIMS PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE BY FILING ANSWER FORM OR SETTLEMENT STIPULATION; Additional Info: Date 2: 09/09/2021; Judicial Officer: Bagge-Hernandez, Michael C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET; Additional Info: Defendant: Callawood, Ken

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Citibank, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Citibank, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO RULE 2-420; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Citibank, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Citibank, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Citibank, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CitiBank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Debski, Michael Thiel