This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 09/05/2020 at 17:25:54 (UTC).

CINTAS CORPORATION NO. 2 vs SHEPPARD ROOFING SERVICE, INC.

Case Summary

On 07/10/2020 CINTAS CORPORATION NO 2 filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SHEPPARD ROOFING SERVICE, INC. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Allen, A. Lisa. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0514

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Allen, A. Lisa

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CINTAS CORPORATION NO. 2

3471 Main Highway Suite 206

Coconut Grove, FL 33133

CINTAS CORPORATION

Defendant

SHEPPARD ROOFING SERVICE, INC.

4173 Crump Road Unit 3

Winter Haven, FL 33881

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BENNETT , MICHAEL PAUL

Attorney at BENNETT AIELLO

3471 Main Hwy Apt 206

Miami, FL 33133

 

Court Documents

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

07/13/2020: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/31/2020
  • Docket20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: 7/27/2020 - DEFT: SHEPPARD ROOFING SERVICE, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: SHEPPARD ROOFING SERVICE, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Defendant: SHEPPARD ROOFING SERVICE, INC.; Plaintiff: CINTAS CORPORATION NO. 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Defendant: SHEPPARD ROOFING SERVICE, INC.; Plaintiff: CINTAS CORPORATION NO. 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Defendant: SHEPPARD ROOFING SERVICE, INC.; Plaintiff: CINTAS CORPORATION NO. 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Defendant: SHEPPARD ROOFING SERVICE, INC.; Plaintiff: CINTAS CORPORATION NO. 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketMOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION; Additional Info: Defendant: SHEPPARD ROOFING SERVICE, INC.; Plaintiff: CINTAS CORPORATION NO. 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Defendant: SHEPPARD ROOFING SERVICE, INC.; Plaintiff: CINTAS CORPORATION NO. 2

    Read MoreRead Less