This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 05/01/2022 at 15:58:24 (UTC).

CIELO SPORTS & FAMILY CHIROPRACTIC CENTRE, LLC,Blazer, Denise vs GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/21/2022 CIELO SPORTS FAMILY CHIROPRACTIC CENTRE, LLC,Blazer, Denise filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Schultz-Kin, Leslie. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4304

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Schultz-Kin, Leslie

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CIELO SPORTS & FAMILY CHIROPRACTIC CENTRE, LLC., a

2700 W. Dr. Mlk Jr. Blvd. Suite 400

Tampa, FL 33607

Blazer, Denise

CIELO SPORTS & FAMILY CHIROPRACTIC CENTRE, LLC

2700 W. Dr. Mlk Jr. Blvd. Suite 400

Tampa, FL 33607

Defendants

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, a foreign corpora

200 E Gaines St

Tallahassee, FL 32399

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

200 E Gaines St

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FRIEDMAN , PHILIP ALAN

Attorney at FL LEGAL GROUP

Friedman Law Associates, P.L. 2700 W Dr Martin Luther King Jr Blvd

Tampa, FL 33607

Defendant Attorney

SMITH , MELANIE

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF DAVID S. DOUGHERTY

4300 W Cypress St Ste 900

Tampa, FL 33607

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

01/21/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

01/21/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

01/21/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/21/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

01/21/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/21/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

MOTION TO - FOR

04/25/2022: MOTION TO - FOR

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

04/25/2022: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

RESPONSE

04/25/2022: RESPONSE

MOTION FOR RELIEF

04/25/2022: MOTION FOR RELIEF

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

03/31/2022: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

03/31/2022: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

03/31/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

MOTION TO STRIKE

03/31/2022: MOTION TO STRIKE

MOTION FOR RELIEF

03/31/2022: MOTION FOR RELIEF

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

02/17/2022: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

02/17/2022: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

02/17/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO - FOR; Comment: DEEM MATTERS ADMITTED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: CIELO SPORTS & FAMILY CHIROPRACTIC CENTRE, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: CIELO SPORTS & FAMILY CHIROPRACTIC CENTRE, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Defendant: GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE; Comment: TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Defendant: GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR RELIEF; Comment: FROM ITS TECHNICAL ADMISSIONS AND REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO FILE A BELATED RESPONSE WITH MEMORANDUM OF LAW; Additional Info: Defendant: GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: CIELO SPORTS & FAMILY CHIROPRACTIC CENTRE, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: CIELO SPORTS & FAMILY CHIROPRACTIC CENTRE, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: CIELO SPORTS & FAMILY CHIROPRACTIC CENTRE, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO STRIKE; Comment: DEFENDANT'S AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: CIELO SPORTS & FAMILY CHIROPRACTIC CENTRE, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR RELIEF; Comment: FROM ITS TECHNICAL ADMISSIONS AND REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO FILE A BELATED RESPONSE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: CIELO SPORTS & FAMILY CHIROPRACTIC CENTRE, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: CIELO SPORTS & FAMILY CHIROPRACTIC CENTRE, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: CIELO SPORTS & FAMILY CHIROPRACTIC CENTRE, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: CIELO SPORTS & FAMILY CHIROPRACTIC CENTRE, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: CIELO SPORTS & FAMILY CHIROPRACTIC CENTRE, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: CIELO SPORTS & FAMILY CHIROPRACTIC CENTRE, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: CIELO SPORTS & FAMILY CHIROPRACTIC CENTRE, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: CIELO SPORTS & FAMILY CHIROPRACTIC CENTRE, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cielo Sports & Family Chiropractic Centre, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SMITH , MELANIE