This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 07/02/2022 at 06:12:35 (UTC).

CHOICE DIAGNOSTIC IMAGING,Sargent, Nicole vs FARMERS CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 04/04/2022 CHOICE DIAGNOSTIC IMAGING,Sargent, Nicole filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against FARMERS CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Schultz-Kin, Leslie. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2052

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Schultz-Kin, Leslie

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CHOICE DIAGNOSTIC IMAGING

Sunrise, FL 33323

Sargent, Nicole

Defendant

FARMERS CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Florida Cfo As Ra 200 East Gaines Street

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ANDERSON , CHRISTIAN CHRISTOPHER

Attorney at CHRISTIAN CHRISTOPHER ANDERSON

1000 Legion Pl Ste 1650

Orlando, FL 32801

Defendant Attorney

EASTERLING , TAISHA

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF SANABRIA & MARSH

Employees Of Farmers Insurance Exchange 2290 Lucien Way Ste 280

Maitland, FL 32751

 

Court Documents

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

04/04/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

04/04/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/04/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

General Differentiated Case Management Order

04/05/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

04/05/2022: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

04/22/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

04/22/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

05/23/2022: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Comment: AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Defendant: FARMERS CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketINTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Defendant: FARMERS CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: FARMERS CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: CHOICE DIAGNOSTIC IMAGING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: FARMERS CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Defendant: FARMERS CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY; Plaintiff: CHOICE DIAGNOSTIC IMAGING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Defendant: FARMERS CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY; Plaintiff: CHOICE DIAGNOSTIC IMAGING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: FARMERS CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY; Plaintiff: CHOICE DIAGNOSTIC IMAGING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Defendant: FARMERS CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY; Plaintiff: CHOICE DIAGNOSTIC IMAGING

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Farmers Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer EASTERLING , TAISHA