This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 08/16/2020 at 15:57:02 (UTC).

CHERIAN, DANIEL vs VANCE, KEYANTI

Case Summary

On 07/10/2020 CHERIAN, DANIEL filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against VANCE, KEYANTI. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Manning, M. Daryl. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0575

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Manning, M. Daryl

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CHERIAN, DANIEL

Riverview, FL 33579

ROSE ESTATES LLC

11413 Lake Lucaya Dr

Riverview, FL 33579

Defendant

VANCE, KEYANTI

Tampa, FL 33612

 

Court Documents

DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

07/23/2020: DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

AFFIDAVIT NON MILITARY SERVICE AND PROOF OF CLAIM

07/22/2020: AFFIDAVIT NON MILITARY SERVICE AND PROOF OF CLAIM

MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

07/22/2020: MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

07/22/2020: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

SUMMONS RETURNED POSTED

07/20/2020: SUMMONS RETURNED POSTED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/10/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

SUMMONS ISSUED AND MAILED

07/10/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED AND MAILED

COMPLAINT

07/10/2020: COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK; Additional Info: Defendant: VANCE, KEYANTI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT NON MILITARY SERVICE AND PROOF OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK; Additional Info: Defendant: VANCE, KEYANTI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED POSTED; Additional Info: Defendant: VANCE, KEYANTI; Date Served: 07/11/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: CHERIAN, DANIEL; Plaintiff: ROSE ESTATES LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: CHERIAN, DANIEL; Plaintiff: ROSE ESTATES LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND MAILED; Comment: PS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: CHERIAN, DANIEL

    Read MoreRead Less