This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 09/17/2020 at 02:47:27 (UTC).

CC OAK CHASE, LLC vs RIVERA, DAVID

Case Summary

On 07/10/2020 CC OAK CHASE, LLC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against RIVERA, DAVID. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Perrone, M. Frances. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0385

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Perrone, M. Frances

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CC OAK CHASE, LLC

12535 Tinsley Circle

Tampa, FL 33612

Defendant

RIVERA, DAVID

Tampa, FL 33612

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LUCAS , JASON MICHAEL

Attorney at THE LUCAS LAW FIRM PA

17833 Murdock Cir Unit B

Port Charlotte, FL 33948

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

09/14/2020: WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

E-FILED PROPOSED WRIT OF POSSESSION

09/10/2020: E-FILED PROPOSED WRIT OF POSSESSION

COURT TICKET

09/08/2020: COURT TICKET

JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION

09/09/2020: JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION

NOTICE OF HEARING

08/14/2020: NOTICE OF HEARING

AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING

08/14/2020: AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING

MOTION FOR JUDGMENT

08/07/2020: MOTION FOR JUDGMENT

LETTER TO CLERK FROM

07/21/2020: LETTER TO CLERK FROM

RESPONSE

07/24/2020: RESPONSE

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

07/21/2020: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

COMPLAINT

07/10/2020: COMPLAINT

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

07/10/2020: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED; Comment: jlodge@lucaslawfirmpa.com; Additional Info: Plaintiff: CC OAK CHASE, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED PROPOSED WRIT OF POSSESSION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: CC OAK CHASE, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • JudgementJudgment Code: JFP; Judgment Description: JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION; Judge: Perrone, Frances M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT TICKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; Comment: (9/8/2020 @ 1:45PM); Additional Info: Plaintiff: CC OAK CHASE, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING; Comment: (9/8/2020 @ 1:45PM); Additional Info: Plaintiff: CC OAK CHASE, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR JUDGMENT; Comment: ON PLEADINGS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: CC OAK CHASE, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE; Additional Info: Defendant: RIVERA, DAVID

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER TO CLERK FROM; Comment: ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Additional Info: Defendant: RIVERA, DAVID

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: CC OAK CHASE, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: CC OAK CHASE, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: CC OAK CHASE, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: CC OAK CHASE, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: RIVERA, DAVID

    Read MoreRead Less