This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 01/23/2022 at 22:55:41 (UTC).

CAYASSO, CHANEL vs CLARK, LAHRIH

Case Summary

On 09/28/2021 CAYASSO, CHANEL filed a Family - Domestic Partnership Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against CLARK, LAHRIH. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Perrone, M. Frances, Perrone, Frances. M and Perrone, Frances M. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3568

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Domestic Partnership Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Perrone, M. Frances

Perrone, Frances. M

Perrone, Frances M

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CAYASSO, CHANEL

Tampa, FL 33612

Respondents

CLARK, LAHRIH

Tampa, FL 33605

CLARK, LAHRIH KAMAU

Tampa, FL 33604

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

MCNEAL , VICTORIA

Attorney at THE SPRING OF TAMPA BAY

Po Box 5147

Tampa, FL 33675

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON SERVICE; Comment: FINAL INJUNCTION, FINAL DOMESTIC VIOLENCE INJUNCTION; Additional Info: Respondent: CLARK, LAHRIH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketCOPY OF ORDER SENT TO PETITIONER VIA TEXT/EMAIL; Comment: AONS-AFFIDAVIT OF NON SERVICE; Additional Info: Petitioner: CAYASSO, CHANEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • HearingAmended Injunction Hearing; Hearing Time: 09:30 AM; Hearing Location: COURTROOM 302 3RD FL 800 E TWIGGS ST TAMPA, FL 33602; Judicial Officer: Perrone, Frances M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT INJUNCTION DOMESTIC VIOLENCE WITH CHILDREN; Additional Info: Petitioner: CAYASSO, CHANEL; Respondent: CLARK, LAHRIH; Date Signed: 11/04/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER SENT TO PETITIONER VIA TEXT/EMAIL; Comment: FJDVWC-FINAL JUDGMENT INJUNCTION DOMESTIC VIOLENCE WITH CHILDREN; Additional Info: Petitioner: CAYASSO, CHANEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketELECTRONICALLY DELIVERED TO HCSO CIVIL PROCESSING UNIT; Comment: Final Judgments Document electronically transmitted to HCSO on 2021-11-04 11:02.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketCOURT DOCKET PAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketINJUNCTION PETITION RETURNED SERVED; Comment: TEMPORARY INJUNCTION, AMENDED DOMESTIC VIOLENCE INJUNCTION, UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION ACT, PETITION, NOTICE OF RELATED CASES; Additional Info: Respondent: CLARK, LAHRIH; Date Served: 10/07/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketCOPY OF ORDER SENT TO PETITIONER VIA TEXT/EMAIL; Comment: IPRS-INJUNCTION PETITION RETURNED SERVED; Additional Info: Petitioner: CAYASSO, CHANEL

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketPETITIONER COPY COVERSHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketINJUNCTION COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketCOPY OF ORDER SENT TO PETITIONER VIA TEXT/EMAIL; Comment: PFIN-PETITION FOR INJUNCTION; Additional Info: Petitioner: CAYASSO, CHANEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketCOPY OF ORDER SENT TO PETITIONER VIA TEXT/EMAIL; Comment: PCCS-PETITIONER COPY COVERSHEET; Additional Info: Petitioner: CAYASSO, CHANEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketCOPY OF ORDER SENT TO PETITIONER VIA TEXT/EMAIL; Comment: ACK-ACKNOWLEDGEMENT; Additional Info: Petitioner: CAYASSO, CHANEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketTEMPORARY INJUNCTION WITH CHILD(REN); Comment: Your request for a temporary injunction against Domestic Violence has been granted. The judge has set a hearing. The hearing date is available at HOVER.hillsclerk.com on the Hearings tab of the case. Certified copies of your Temporary Injunction are ; Additional Info: Petitioner: CAYASSO, CHANEL; Respondent: CLARK, LAHRIH; Date Signed: 09/28/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER SENT TO PETITIONER VIA TEXT/EMAIL; Comment: TIWC-TEMPORARY INJUNCTION WITH CHILD(REN); Additional Info: Petitioner: CAYASSO, CHANEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketELECTRONICALLY DELIVERED TO HCSO CIVIL PROCESSING UNIT; Comment: Temporary/Amended Injunctions Document electronically transmitted to HCSO on 2021-09-28 16:17.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCNEAL , VICTORIA