This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 03/06/2023 at 12:47:00 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC As Assignee Of Citibank, N.A. vs HALL, TIMOTHY

Case Summary

On 05/25/2022 CAVALRY SPV I, LLC As Assignee Of Citibank, N A filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HALL, TIMOTHY. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Lopez, S. Susan, Makholm, S. Marc and Makholm, Marc. S. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5051

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Lopez, S. Susan

Makholm, S. Marc

Makholm, Marc. S

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC As Assignee Of Citibank, N.A.

Defendant

HALL, TIMOTHY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MAYERS , BREANNA NICOLE TIFFANY

Attorney at MS. BREANNA NICOLE TIFFANY MAYERS

Amsouth Bldg 100 N Tampa St

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

12/03/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

COURT TICKET

08/25/2022: COURT TICKET

E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

07/13/2022: E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

07/12/2022: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

COMPLAINT

05/25/2022: COMPLAINT

CERTIFIED COPY OF

05/25/2022: CERTIFIED COPY OF

CERTIFIED COPY OF

05/25/2022: CERTIFIED COPY OF

COPY OF

05/25/2022: COPY OF

Event To Hold All Other Pleadings

05/25/2022: Event To Hold All Other Pleadings

Event To Hold All Other Pleadings

05/25/2022: Event To Hold All Other Pleadings

Event To Hold All Other Pleadings

05/25/2022: Event To Hold All Other Pleadings

Event To Hold All Other Pleadings

05/25/2022: Event To Hold All Other Pleadings

Event To Hold All Other Pleadings

05/25/2022: Event To Hold All Other Pleadings

Event To Hold All Other Pleadings

05/25/2022: Event To Hold All Other Pleadings

Event To Hold All Other Pleadings

05/25/2022: Event To Hold All Other Pleadings

Event To Hold All Other Pleadings

05/25/2022: Event To Hold All Other Pleadings

Event To Hold All Other Pleadings

05/25/2022: Event To Hold All Other Pleadings

Event To Hold All Other Pleadings

05/25/2022: Event To Hold All Other Pleadings

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED; Comment: TIMOTHY HALL; Additional Info: Plaintiff: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC As Assignee Of Citibank, N.A.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • HearingPRETRIAL; Hearing Time: 09:30 AM; Hearing Location: COURTROOM 800 E TWIGGS ST TAMPA, FL 33602;; Judicial Officer: Judge, Senior

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT TICKET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET; Additional Info: Defendant: HALL, TIMOTHY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC As Assignee Of Citibank, N.A.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Comment: (Transferred Case)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY OF; Comment: ORDER TRANSFERRING VENUE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY OF; Comment: PINELLAS COUNTY COURT CASE DOCKET SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOPY OF; Comment: RECEIPT FOR FILE MAILED BACK TO PINELLAS COUNTY CLERK OF COURT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent To Hold All Other Pleadings; Comment: From the Pinellas County Court Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent To Hold All Other Pleadings; Comment: From the Pinellas County Court Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent To Hold All Other Pleadings; Comment: From the Pinellas County Court Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent To Hold All Other Pleadings; Comment: From the Pinellas County Court Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent To Hold All Other Pleadings; Comment: From the Pinellas County Court Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent To Hold All Other Pleadings; Comment: From the Pinellas County Court Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent To Hold All Other Pleadings; Comment: From the Pinellas County Court Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent To Hold All Other Pleadings; Comment: From the Pinellas County Court Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent To Hold All Other Pleadings; Comment: From the Pinellas County Court Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSMITTAL LETTER; Additional Info: Private Attorney: MAYERS , BREANNA NICOLE TIFFANY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less