This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 06/09/2023 at 10:07:53 (UTC).

ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC vs MCCALLUM, BETTINA M

Case Summary

On 05/12/2023 ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against MCCALLUM, BETTINA M. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Makholm, S. Marc, Makholm, Marc. S and Makholm, Marc S. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5584

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Makholm, S. Marc

Makholm, Marc. S

Makholm, Marc S

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC

Wilmington Trust, N.A.

Defendant

MCCALLUM, BETTINA M

Trustee

OneMain Financial Issuance Trust 2020-2

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Trustee Attorney

ROLFE , AMANDA CLAY

 

Court Documents

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

05/12/2023: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

05/12/2023: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/12/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

05/15/2023: E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

05/22/2023: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2023
  • HearingPRETRIAL; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Hearing Location: COURTROOM 416 800 E TWIGGS TAMPA, FL 33602;; Judicial Officer: Makholm, Marc S

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: BETTINA M. MCCALLUM 20th day of May, 2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET; Additional Info: Defendant: MCCALLUM, BETTINA M;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less