This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 09/13/2023 at 06:40:10 (UTC).

Truist Bank vs Shannon, Jennifer Juan

Case Summary

On 05/24/2023 Truist Bank filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Shannon, Jennifer Juan. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Thomas, K. Cheryl and Thomas, Cheryl. K. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2735

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Thomas, K. Cheryl

Thomas, Cheryl. K

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Truist Bank

Defendants

Pino, Bettty

Pino, Robert J

Shannon, Jennifer Juan

Unknown Spouse Of Jennifer Juan Shannon A/K/A Jennifer K. Shannon

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

YORK , JULIE

HENDERSON , BRANDEN MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

08/14/2023: DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

08/02/2023: MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

Signature Page For Clerk's Default

08/02/2023: Signature Page For Clerk's Default

Streamlined Differentiated Case Management Order

06/02/2023: Streamlined Differentiated Case Management Order

LIS PENDENS

05/24/2023: LIS PENDENS

COMPLAINT

05/24/2023: COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

07/26/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY(S)

07/03/2023: NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY(S)

ALIAS SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

06/20/2023: ALIAS SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

06/20/2023: 20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

06/20/2023: 20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

06/20/2023: 20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

LIS PENDENS (RECORDABLE)

06/02/2023: LIS PENDENS (RECORDABLE)

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

06/02/2023: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

06/02/2023: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

06/02/2023: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

06/02/2023: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF FILING

05/24/2023: NOTICE OF FILING

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK; Additional Info: Defendant: Pino, Bettty; Defendant: Pino, Robert J; Defendant: Shannon, Jennifer Juan;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK; Additional Info: Defendant: Pino, Bettty; Defendant: Pino, Robert J; Defendant: Shannon, Jennifer Juan;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSignature Page For Clerk's Default; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Truist Bank;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Truist Bank;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • JudgementJudgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2023297280; Judge: Thomas, Cheryl K

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY(S); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Truist Bank;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketALIAS SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED; Comment: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JENNIFER JUAN SHANNON A/K/A JENNIFER J. SHANNON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: JENNIFER JUAN SHANNON A/K/A JENNIFER J. SHANNON 06/17/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: ROBERT J. PINO 06/15/223

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Truist Bank;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Truist Bank;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Truist Bank;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE REAL PROPERTY CLAIM FORM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Truist Bank;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Truist Bank;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Truist Bank;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Truist Bank;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Truist Bank;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Truist Bank;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Truist Bank;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less