This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 09/05/2023 at 23:18:42 (UTC).

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY vs GARVIN, HAYWARD, Jr

Case Summary

On 04/11/2023 PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GARVIN, HAYWARD, Jr. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Perrone, Frances. M, Perrone, Frances M and Perrone, M. Frances. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4129

  • Filing Date:

    04/11/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Perrone, Frances. M

Perrone, Frances M

Perrone, M. Frances

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DOSPEHOFF, JULIA

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

GARVIN, HAYWARD, Jr

WOODSIDE, DERION ALEXANDE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KORNFIELD , GARY CARL

 

Court Documents

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

04/11/2023: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

04/11/2023: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

04/11/2023: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/11/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

04/13/2023: E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

04/13/2023: E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

05/16/2023: SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

05/16/2023: SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

06/28/2023: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

E-FILED ALIAS PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

06/30/2023: E-FILED ALIAS PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

ALIAS SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

07/25/2023: ALIAS SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/07/2023
  • HearingPRETRIAL; Cancelled Comments: Non-Service on Summons; Hearing Time: 09:30 AM; Hearing Location: COURTROOM 302 3RD FL 800 E TWIGGS ST TAMPA, FL 33602;; Judicial Officer: Perrone, Frances M

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketALIAS SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED; Comment: HAYWARD GARVIN JR; Additional Info: Plaintiff: PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED ALIAS PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET; Additional Info: Defendant: GARVIN, HAYWARD, Jr;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2023
  • HearingPRETRIAL; Cancelled Comments: Non-Service on Summons; Hearing Time: 09:30 AM; Hearing Location: COURTROOM 302 3RD FL 800 E TWIGGS ST TAMPA, FL 33602;; Judicial Officer: Perrone, Frances M

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED; Comment: HAYWARD GARVIN JR; Additional Info: Plaintiff: PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED; Comment: DERION A WOODSIDE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET; Additional Info: Defendant: GARVIN, HAYWARD, Jr;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET; Additional Info: Defendant: WOODSIDE, DERION ALEXANDE;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less