This case was last updated from Not Yet Classified on 08/30/2023 at 16:19:18 (UTC).

Kendrick, Johnny vs Milhouse, Jayla

Case Summary

On 03/23/2023 Kendrick, Johnny filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Milhouse, Jayla. This case was filed in Not Yet Classified, Not Yet Classified. The Judges overseeing this case are Nash, C.. Christopher, Gaylord Moe, .. Anne-Leigh and Gaylord Moe, Anne-Leigh. .. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9394

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Not Yet Classified

Judge Details

Judges

Nash, C.. Christopher

Gaylord Moe, .. Anne-Leigh

Gaylord Moe, Anne-Leigh. .

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kendrick, Johnny

Defendants

Milhouse, Jayla

The Terminix International Company Limited Partnership

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FARAH , KHALIL E

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

03/23/2023: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUBPOENA TO BE ISSUED

03/23/2023: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUBPOENA TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUBPOENA TO BE ISSUED

03/23/2023: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUBPOENA TO BE ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

03/23/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

04/07/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

04/18/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

04/18/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

04/18/2023: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

04/18/2023: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

04/18/2023: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

04/18/2023: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

MOTION FOR CONSOLIDATION

04/18/2023: MOTION FOR CONSOLIDATION

ORDER TO TRANSFER TO DIVISION HT AND STAY

04/25/2023: ORDER TO TRANSFER TO DIVISION HT AND STAY

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO TRANSFER TO DIVISION HT AND STAY; Additional Info: Defendant: Milhouse, Jayla; Defendant: The Terminix International Company Limited Partnership; Plaintiff: Kendrick, Johnny; Date Signed: 04/24/2023;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR CONSOLIDATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Kendrick, Johnny;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Kendrick, Johnny;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Kendrick, Johnny;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Kendrick, Johnny;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Kendrick, Johnny;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less