This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 11/23/2023 at 12:04:37 (UTC).

NEWREZ LLC vs Trustee Partners of Mid Florida, LLC

Case Summary

On 09/15/2023 NEWREZ LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Trustee Partners of Mid Florida, LLC. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Nash, Christopher. C. and Nash, C.. Christopher. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5245

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Nash, Christopher. C.

Nash, C.. Christopher

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NEWREZ LLC

Defendants

CYPRESS CREEK OF HILLSBOROUGH HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATI

Unknown Tenant(s) in Possession #1

Trustee Partners of Mid Florida, LLC

Unknown Tenant(s) in Possession #2

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROSALER , BRIAN LEE

Defendant Attorneys

ARIAS , CARLOS RAMON

YESNER , SHAWN MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Streamlined Differentiated Case Management Order

09/18/2023: Streamlined Differentiated Case Management Order

COMPLAINT

09/15/2023: COMPLAINT

AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE WITH FORECLOSURE PROCEDURES

11/14/2023: AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE WITH FORECLOSURE PROCEDURES

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

10/07/2023: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

11/02/2023: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

AFFIDAVIT AS TO INDEBTEDNESS

11/02/2023: AFFIDAVIT AS TO INDEBTEDNESS

AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS

11/02/2023: AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS

AFFIDAVIT AS TO ATTORNEY FEES

11/02/2023: AFFIDAVIT AS TO ATTORNEY FEES

DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

10/30/2023: DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

10/25/2023: MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

10/20/2023: 20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

10/18/2023: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

10/18/2023: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

10/16/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

LIS PENDENS (RECORDABLE)

09/18/2023: LIS PENDENS (RECORDABLE)

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

09/18/2023: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

09/18/2023: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

09/18/2023: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

11/14/2023
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE WITH FORECLOSURE PROCEDURES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: NEWREZ LLC;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/09/2023

DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Comment: SUPPORTING AFFIDAVIT AS TO ATTORNEY FEES, ATTACHED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: NEWREZ LLC;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/06/2023

DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Defendant: Trustee Partners of Mid Florida, LLC;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/03/2023

DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Comment: ATTACHED: ORIGINAL NOTE AND MORTGAGE (MAILED TO CLERK FROM PLNTFF 11/2/23); Additional Info: Plaintiff: NEWREZ LLC;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/02/2023
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIDAVIT AS TO ATTORNEY FEES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: NEWREZ LLC;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/02/2023
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: NEWREZ LLC;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/02/2023
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIDAVIT AS TO INDEBTEDNESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: NEWREZ LLC;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/02/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: NEWREZ LLC;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/30/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK; Additional Info: Defendant: Unknown Tenant(s) in Possession #1;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/25/2023

DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: NEWREZ LLC;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: NEWREZ LLC;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: NEWREZ LLC;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketLIS PENDENS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: NEWREZ LLC;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: NEWREZ LLC;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: NEWREZ LLC;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketVALUE OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE REAL PROPERTY CLAIM FORM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: NEWREZ LLC;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: NEWREZ LLC;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: NEWREZ LLC;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

DocketStreamline Differentiated Case Management Applies

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

[+] Read More [-] Read Less