This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 09/16/2023 at 00:52:39 (UTC).

WATERS MEDICAL REHAB, INC.,FERNANDEZ, CARLOS vs STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/19/2023 WATERS MEDICAL REHAB, INC ,FERNANDEZ, CARLOS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Valkenburg, Miriam. V. and Valkenburg, V.. Miriam. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7183

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Valkenburg, Miriam. V.

Valkenburg, V.. Miriam

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FERNANDEZ, CARLOS

WATERS MEDICAL REHAB, INC.

Defendant

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GUDIN , GREGORY EDWARD

Defendant Attorney

MOSES , MARSHA MARIA

 

Court Documents

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME

07/11/2023: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME

General Differentiated Case Management Order

05/23/2023: General Differentiated Case Management Order

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME

08/08/2023: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME

08/25/2023: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

08/07/2023: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

07/27/2023: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

07/27/2023: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

07/27/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

07/27/2023: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

07/11/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

07/11/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

05/19/2023: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

05/23/2023: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/19/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

05/19/2023: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

05/19/2023: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

05/19/2023: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

05/19/2023: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME; Comment: TO RESPOND TO PLTFS DISCOVERT; Additional Info: Defendant: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WATERS MEDICAL REHAB, INC.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WATERS MEDICAL REHAB, INC.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WATERS MEDICAL REHAB, INC.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WATERS MEDICAL REHAB, INC.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Comment: AND DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Defendant: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WATERS MEDICAL REHAB, INC.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 05/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WATERS MEDICAL REHAB, INC.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WATERS MEDICAL REHAB, INC.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: WATERS MEDICAL REHAB, INC.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WATERS MEDICAL REHAB, INC.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WATERS MEDICAL REHAB, INC.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WATERS MEDICAL REHAB, INC.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WATERS MEDICAL REHAB, INC.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less