This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 09/06/2023 at 14:36:31 (UTC).

STOCK CHIROPRACTIC WELLNESS CENTER, P.A.,DAMASK, CAROLINE vs AUTO CLUB INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA

Case Summary

On 05/22/2023 STOCK CHIROPRACTIC WELLNESS CENTER, P A ,DAMASK, CAROLINE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against AUTO CLUB INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Murphy, J. Logan and Chandler, Cory. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7489

  • Filing Date:

    05/22/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Murphy, J. Logan

Chandler, Cory

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

STOCK CHIROPRACTIC WELLNESS CENTER, P.A.

DAMASK, CAROLINE

Defendant

AUTO CLUB INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GUDIN , GREGORY EDWARD

Defendant Attorney

PAFITES , ANDREW JOSEPH GEORGE, Jr

 

Court Documents

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

05/22/2023: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

05/22/2023: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/22/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

05/24/2023: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

05/24/2023: General Differentiated Case Management Order

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

05/22/2023: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

07/11/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

07/27/2023: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

07/27/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

08/08/2023: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

08/08/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

08/08/2023: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

08/08/2023: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: STOCK CHIROPRACTIC WELLNESS CENTER, P.A.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: STOCK CHIROPRACTIC WELLNESS CENTER, P.A.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: STOCK CHIROPRACTIC WELLNESS CENTER, P.A.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: STOCK CHIROPRACTIC WELLNESS CENTER, P.A.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Comment: AND DISCLOSURE DESIGNATION OF PRINCIPAL E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Defendant: AUTO CLUB INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Comment: TO COMPLAINT - AND DEFENDANT HEREBY DEMANDS A JURY TRIAL OF ALL ISSUES TRIABLE OF RIGHT BY A JURY; Additional Info: Defendant: AUTO CLUB INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: STOCK CHIROPRACTIC WELLNESS CENTER, P.A.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: AUTO CLUB INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: STOCK CHIROPRACTIC WELLNESS CENTER, P.A.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: STOCK CHIROPRACTIC WELLNESS CENTER, P.A.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: STOCK CHIROPRACTIC WELLNESS CENTER, P.A.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: STOCK CHIROPRACTIC WELLNESS CENTER, P.A.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less