This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 11/10/2023 at 06:05:15 (UTC).

J G Wentworth Originations LLC vs Metropolitan Life Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 09/15/2023 J G Wentworth Originations LLC filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Bauman, A.. Robert, Bauman, Robert. A. and Bauman, Robert A.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5227

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Bauman, A.. Robert

Bauman, Robert. A.

Bauman, Robert A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

J G Wentworth Originations LLC

Defendants

MetLife Tower Resources Group Inc

Metropolitan Life Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PETITT , RICHARD THOMAS

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

09/15/2023: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

COMPLAINT

09/15/2023: COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/15/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

General Differentiated Case Management Order

09/18/2023: General Differentiated Case Management Order

NOTICE OF HEARING

09/28/2023: NOTICE OF HEARING

FINAL ORDER GRANTING

10/31/2023: FINAL ORDER GRANTING

 

Docket Entries

05/03/2024

HearingDifferentiated Case Management; Cancelled Comments: SET IN ERROR; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Hearing Location: HTTPS://ZOOM.US/J/92333190791 MEETING ID: 923 3319 0791; Judicial Officer: Bauman, Robert A.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/05/2024

HearingDifferentiated Case Management; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Hearing Location: HTTPS://ZOOM.US/J/92333190791 MEETING ID: 923 3319 0791; Judicial Officer: Bauman, Robert A.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/31/2023

HearingJAWS HEARING; Hearing Time: 09:30 AM; Hearing Location: 800 E. Twiggs St. Tampa, FL 33602 Room 502View Case Hearing Notice for Additional Details, as applicable.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/31/2023

JudgementJudgment Code: FOG; Judgment Description: FINAL ORDER GRANTING; Instrument Number: 2023508862; Judge: Bauman, Robert A.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/31/2023
View Court Documents

JudgementJudgment Code: FOG; Judgment Description: FINAL ORDER GRANTING; Instrument Number: 2023508861; Judge: Bauman, Robert A.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/31/2023
View Court Documents

DocketFINAL ORDER GRANTING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/31/2023

DocketFINAL ORDER GRANTING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; Comment: VIDEO - October 31, 2023, at 9:30 a.m.; Additional Info: Plaintiff: J G Wentworth Originations LLC;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: J G Wentworth Originations LLC;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: J G Wentworth Originations LLC;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: J G Wentworth Originations LLC;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less