This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 12/03/2023 at 07:01:57 (UTC).

AFO IMAGING, INC,PARKER, LACEY vs NATIONAL GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/29/2023 AFO IMAGING, INC,PARKER, LACEY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against NATIONAL GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Chandler, Cory and Murphy, J. Logan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7900

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Chandler, Cory

Murphy, J. Logan

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ADVANCED DIAGNOSTIC GROUP

AFO IMAGING, INC

PARKER, LACEY

Defendant

NATIONAL GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GUDIN , GREGORY EDWARD

Defendant Attorney

MUNIZ , HECTOR DANILLO, Jr

 

Court Documents

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

09/29/2023: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

09/29/2023: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/29/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

General Differentiated Case Management Order

10/03/2023: General Differentiated Case Management Order

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

10/03/2023: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

11/16/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

MOTION TO DISMISS

11/21/2023: MOTION TO DISMISS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

11/30/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

 

Docket Entries

11/30/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AFO IMAGING, INC;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/21/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION TO DISMISS; Comment: AND MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER; Additional Info: Defendant: NATIONAL GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY; Private Attorney: MUNIZ , HECTOR DANILLO, Jr;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/16/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: NATIONAL GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/03/2023
View Court Documents

DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: NATIONAL GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/03/2023
View Court Documents

DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2023
View Court Documents

DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AFO IMAGING, INC;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2023
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: AFO IMAGING, INC;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2023

DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AFO IMAGING, INC;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AFO IMAGING, INC;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2023

DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2023

DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

[+] Read More [-] Read Less